This case was last updated from PACER on 12/17/2019 at 08:08:19 (UTC).

Graves v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 10/18/2019 Graves filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are F. Keith Ball and Keith Starrett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00157

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

F. Keith Ball

Presiding Judge

Keith Starrett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melissa Graves

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Interested Party

SSA General Counsel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mager A. Varnado, Jr.

Attorney at MAGER A. VARNADO, JR., ATTORNEY

P. O. Box 1807, 2210 Pass Road, Suite C (39501)

Gulfport, MS 39502

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER Directing Filing of Briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 10/31/2019. (JEJ) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Second MOTION for Melissa A. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Graves (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Varnado, Mager) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set as to #4 First MOTION for Melissa A. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4120932). Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. Counsel for Plaintiff shall contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (CS) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • **ERROR DISREGARD** DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #1 , #2 : Division name incorrect. Attorney is directed to use "Eastern Division" in future filings (CS) Modified on 11/12/2019 (CS). (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER Directing Filing of Briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 10/31/2019. (JEJ) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) First MOTION for Melissa A. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4120932) by Melissa Graves (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Varnado, Mager) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 10/21/19 (dfk) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #1 : Division name incorrect. Attorney is directed to use "Eastern Division" in future filings. (CS) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Melissa Graves. (CS) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Melissa Graves. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Appeals Council Notice) (CS) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less