This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2023 at 07:21:57 (UTC).

Graves v. Blackberry Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 Graves filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Blackberry Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jennifer C. Boal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-10024

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jennifer C. Boal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephen Graves

Defendant

Blackberry Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kristen M. Hurley

Philip J. Gordon

Defendant Attorneys

Latiqua M Liles

Keith H. Bensten

William D. Black

John C Petrell

John Petrella

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) Joint CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Joint Statement of Counsel Under Local Rule 161. (Bensten, Keith) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#21

(#21) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Defendant Blackberry Corporation's Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1(d)(3). (Bensten, Keith) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#20

(#20) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. A Scheduling Conference is set for March 8, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. by remote proceedings before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (York, Steve) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

#19

(#19) CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Blackberry Corporation.. (Black, William) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

#18

(#18) CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Blackberry Corporation.. (Black, William) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to Complaint by Blackberry Corporation.(Bensten, Keith) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#15

(#15) STATE COURT Record. (Bensten, Keith) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by John Petrella on behalf of Blackberry Corporation (Petrella, John) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#12

(#13) Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to January 31, 2023 to Extend Defendant's Deadline to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. (York, Steve) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

4 #1

Exhibit A - Declaration of John Petrella

#4

(#9) Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John C. Petrella. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (York, Steve) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blackberry Corporation. (Bensten, Keith) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

2 #4

Category Form Category Form

2 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Exhibit B - Declaration of Jennifer Bramhill

2 #1

Exhibit A - Superior Court docs

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Blackberry Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9654126 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Superior Court docs, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jennifer Bramhill, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form Category Form)(Bensten, Keith) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Appearance by Keith H. Bensten on behalf of Blackberry Corporation (Bensten, Keith) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) Joint CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Joint Statement of Counsel Under Local Rule 161. (Bensten, Keith) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Defendant Blackberry Corporation's Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1(d)(3). (Bensten, Keith) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. A Scheduling Conference is set for March 8, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. by remote proceedings before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (York, Steve) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Blackberry Corporation.. (Black, William) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Blackberry Corporation.. (Black, William) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

Docket(#17) ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (York, Steve) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) ANSWER to Complaint by Blackberry Corporation.(Bensten, Keith) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) STATE COURT Record. (Bensten, Keith) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by John Petrella on behalf of Blackberry Corporation (Petrella, John) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to January 31, 2023 to Extend Defendant's Deadline to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. (York, Steve) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
01/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Latiqua M. Liles. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (York, Steve) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John C. Petrella. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (York, Steve) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023

Docket(#8) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Currie, Haley) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by William D. Black on behalf of Blackberry Corporation (Black, William) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Latiqua M. Liles Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9654179 by Blackberry Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Latiqua Liles)(Bensten, Keith) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John C. Petrella Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9654171 by Blackberry Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of John Petrella)(Bensten, Keith) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blackberry Corporation. (Bensten, Keith) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Blackberry Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9654126 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Superior Court docs, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jennifer Bramhill, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form Category Form)(Bensten, Keith) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE of Appearance by Keith H. Bensten on behalf of Blackberry Corporation (Bensten, Keith) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less