Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/22/2019 at 08:20:10 (UTC).

Graves v. Bayer Pharma AG, et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 Graves filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Bayer Pharma AG. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eldon E. Fallon and Michael North. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01386

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eldon E. Fallon

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beverly Graves

Defendants

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Janssen Research & Development LLC

Johnson & Johnson

Bayer Corporation

Bayer Pharma AG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Molly Marie Hamilton

Attorney at Hamilton Law Firm PC

606 Ontario St., P.O. Box 188

Storm Lake, IA 50588

Defendant Attorney

Kimberly K. Hardeman

Attorney at Moyer & Bergman, PLC

2720 1St Avenue N.E., P. O. Box 1943

Cedar Rapids, IA 52406-1943

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

9 #1

*Restricted*

#9

(#9) Case transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00042. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (mmv) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#8

(#8) Certified Conditional Transfer Order 184 by Clerk's Office, Eastern District of Louisiana. (slg) [Transferred from iasd on 2/25/2019.] (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#7

(#7) Certified Conditional Transfer Order MDL No. 2592 for Eastern District of Louisiana. (slg) [Transferred from iasd on 2/25/2019.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#5

(#5) TEXT ORDER granting #4 all Defendants unresisted Motion for Extension of Time to and including March 11, 2019, to move or plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 2/6/2019. (mlr) [Transferred from iasd on 2/25/2019.] (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#4

(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Hardeman, Kimberly) [Transferred from iasd on 2/25/2019.] (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#3

(#3) Letter to MDL Panel regarding Potential Tag-Along Action. Paperwork emailed to MDL Panel. (kjw) [Transferred from iasd on 2/25/2019.] (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Pharma AG. (Hardeman, Kimberly) [Transferred from iasd on 2/25/2019.] (Entered: 02/04/2019)

1 #3

Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #2

State Court Pleadings

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bayer Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development from Marion County, case number LACV096890. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3720784., filed by Bayer Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Hardeman, Kimberly) [Transferred from iasd on 2/25/2019.] (Entered: 02/04/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Case transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00042. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (mmv) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certified Conditional Transfer Order 184 by Clerk's Office, Eastern District of Louisiana. (slg) [Transferred from iasd on 2/25/2019.] (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • ***Civil Case Terminated. (slg) [Transferred from iasd on 2/25/2019.] (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certified Conditional Transfer Order MDL No. 2592 for Eastern District of Louisiana. (slg) [Transferred from iasd on 2/25/2019.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • (#6) TEXT MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-184) Finalized on 2/14/19. Please see pleading (3 in IAS/4:19-cv-00042, 1496 in MDL No. 2592).As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer.The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the E.D. Louisiana for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 2/14/2019. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2592, IAS/4:19-cv-00042 (DP) (slg) [Transferred from iasd on 2/25/2019.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) TEXT ORDER granting #4 all Defendants unresisted Motion for Extension of Time to and including March 11, 2019, to move or plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 2/6/2019. (mlr) [Transferred from iasd on 2/25/2019.] (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Hardeman, Kimberly) [Transferred from iasd on 2/25/2019.] (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter to MDL Panel regarding Potential Tag-Along Action. Paperwork emailed to MDL Panel. (kjw) [Transferred from iasd on 2/25/2019.] (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Pharma AG. (Hardeman, Kimberly) [Transferred from iasd on 2/25/2019.] (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bayer Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development from Marion County, case number LACV096890. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3720784., filed by Bayer Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Hardeman, Kimberly) [Transferred from iasd on 2/25/2019.] (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bayer HealthCare LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bayer Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC f/k/a JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC is a litigant