This case was last updated from PACER on 04/05/2019 at 07:30:42 (UTC).

Graves v. Bayer Pharma AG et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2019 Graves filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Bayer Pharma AG. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Celeste F. Bremer and Stephanie M. Rose. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00042

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Celeste F. Bremer

Presiding Judge

Stephanie M. Rose

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beverly Graves

Defendants

Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Janssen Research & Development, LLC

Johnson & Johnson

Bayer Corporation

Bayer Pharma AG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Molly Marie Hamilton

Attorney at HAMILTON LAW FIRM PC

12345 University Avenue, Suite 309

Clive, IA 50325

Defendant Attorney

Kimberly K Hardeman

Attorney at LEDERER WESTON CRAIG PLC

118 Third Avenue, S.E., Suite 700

Cedar Rapids, IA 52401

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Certified Conditional Transfer Order 184 by Clerk's Office, Eastern District of Louisiana. (slg) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#7

(#7) Certified Conditional Transfer Order MDL No. 2592 for Eastern District of Louisiana. (slg) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#5

(#5) TEXT ORDER granting #4 all Defendants unresisted Motion for Extension of Time to and including March 11, 2019, to move or plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 2/6/2019. (mlr) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#4

(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Hardeman, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#3

(#3) Letter to MDL Panel regarding Potential Tag-Along Action. Paperwork emailed to MDL Panel. (kjw) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Pharma AG. (Hardeman, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

1 #3

Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #2

State Court Pleadings

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bayer Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development from Marion County, case number LACV096890. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3720784., filed by Bayer Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Hardeman, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certified Conditional Transfer Order 184 by Clerk's Office, Eastern District of Louisiana. (slg) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • ***Civil Case Terminated. Electronically sent to Eastern District of Louisiana. (slg) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certified Conditional Transfer Order MDL No. 2592 for Eastern District of Louisiana. (slg) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • (#6) TEXT MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-184) Finalized on 2/14/19. Please see pleading (3 in IAS/4:19-cv-00042, 1496 in MDL No. 2592).As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer.The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the E.D. Louisiana for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 2/14/2019. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2592, IAS/4:19-cv-00042 (DP) (slg) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) TEXT ORDER granting #4 all Defendants unresisted Motion for Extension of Time to and including March 11, 2019, to move or plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 2/6/2019. (mlr) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. (Hardeman, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter to MDL Panel regarding Potential Tag-Along Action. Paperwork emailed to MDL Panel. (kjw) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Pharma AG. (Hardeman, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bayer Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development from Marion County, case number LACV096890. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3720784., filed by Bayer Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Hardeman, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less