This case was last updated from PACER on 12/30/2019 at 08:30:09 (UTC).

Graves II v. Oregonian

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 Graves II filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Oregonian. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judges overseeing this case are John V. Acosta and Jolie A. Russo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01755

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John V. Acosta

Jolie A. Russo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cedric H.E. Graves II

Troutdale, OR 97060

Defendant

Oregonian

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . Signed on 11/1/19 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/1/19.) (peg) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/4/19.) (eo) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#1

(#1) Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Cedric H.E. Graves II against Oregonian (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (rs) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#2

(#2) Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Cedric H.E. Graves II. (rs) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#4

(#4) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/2/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/30/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 3/30/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/01/2019.) (rs) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/4/19.) (eo) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/2/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/30/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 3/30/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/01/2019.) (rs) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . Signed on 11/1/19 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/1/19.) (peg) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Cedric H.E. Graves II. (rs) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Cedric H.E. Graves II against Oregonian (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (rs) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.