This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 05:20:11 (UTC).

Gravely v. Americans for Prosperity

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 Gravely filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Americans for Prosperity. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James C. Dever, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00197

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Dever, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anna Beavon Gravely

Defendant

Americans for Prosperity

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Erik Hjelt

Attorney at Kornbluth Ginsberg Law Group, P.A.

3400 Croasdaile Drive, Suite 300

Durham, NC 27705

Michael A. Kornbluth

Attorney at Kornbluth Ginsberg Law Group, P.A.

3400 Croasdaile Drive, Suite 300

Durham, NC 27705

Defendant Attorneys

Randall D. Avram

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

4208 Six Forks Rd., Suite 1400

Raleigh, NC 27609

Chang Yu

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

4208 Six Forks Rd., Suite 1400

Raleigh, NC 27609

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - State Lawsuit Filings

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Executed Waiver of Service of Summons

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Complaint

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Appearance filed by Michael A. Kornbluth on behalf of Anna Beavon Gravely. (Kornbluth, Michael) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketCase Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Americans for Prosperity. (Yu, Chang) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/21/2020. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph Erik Hjelt on behalf of Anna Beavon Gravely. (Hjelt, Joseph) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Americans for Prosperity. (Avram, Randall) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketCase transferred in from Eastern Division on 05/13/2020. Old Case Number 4:20-cv-79. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order Redesignating Division - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Western Division case. The Honorable James C. Dever III, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 5:20-CV-197-D. No further filing shall be made in 4:20-CV-79-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/13/2020. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Michael A. Kornbluth and Joseph Hjelt ofKornbluth Ginsberg Law Group, P.A. at 34 Croasdaile Drive, Suite 300, Durham, NC 27705 mailed May 13, 2020. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Western division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice filed by Americans for Prosperity Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Avram, Randall) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Chang Yu on behalf of Americans for Prosperity. (Yu, Chang) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Americans for Prosperity (Avram, Randall) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Randall D. Avram on behalf of Americans for Prosperity. (Avram, Randall) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Americans for Prosperity from Superior Court of Wake County, case number 20-CVS-4726. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5423389), filed by Americans for Prosperity. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Executed Waiver of Service of Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Lawsuit Filings, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Avram, Randall) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITIZENS FOR A HEALTHY COMMUNITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chang Yu

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Randall D. Avram