This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2023 at 08:48:55 (UTC).

Gravel Rating Systems LLC v. Sephora USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 Gravel Rating Systems LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Sephora USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00998

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gravel Rating Systems LLC

Defendant

Sephora USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy Devlin

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm LLC - Wilmington

1526 Gilpin Ave.

Wilmington, DE 19806

Defendant Attorney

Neil J McNabnay

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gravel Rating Systems LLC (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Sephora USA, Inc. (daj, ) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sephora USA, Inc.( McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

#6

(#6) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sephora USA, Inc..( McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Sephora USA, Inc. to 2/1/2023. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, ) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sephora USA, Inc..( McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Sephora USA, Inc. to 1/18/2023. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, ) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sephora USA, Inc.( McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Sephora USA, Inc. (daj, ) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (daj, ) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (daj, ) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gravel Rating Systems LLC (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Sephora USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9241461.), filed by Gravel Rating Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less