This case was last updated from PACER on 08/01/2020 at 11:20:17 (UTC).

Granville v. QEP Energy Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 Granville filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against QEP Energy Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Clare R. Hochhalter and Daniel M. Traynor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00098

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Dakota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Clare R. Hochhalter

Presiding Judge

Daniel M. Traynor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sean A. Granville

Defendants

QEP Energy Company

Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin L. Williams

Attorney at Williams Attorneys, PLLC

500 N. Water Street, Suite 500

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Jeffrey Scott Weikum

Attorney at PAGEL WEIKUM, PLLP

1715 Burnt Boat Dr, Madison Suite

Bismarck, ND 58503

Defendant Attorneys

John C. Hughes

Attorney at Meagher & Geer, P.L.L.P. (MN)

33 South Sixth Street, Suite 4400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Robert B. Stock

Attorney at Vogel Law Firm (Fargo)

218 Np Avenue, Po Box 1389

Fargo, ND 58107-1389

Jordan B. Weir

Attorney at Vogel Law Firm (Fargo)

218 Np Avenue, Po Box 1389

Fargo, ND 58107-1389

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by QEP Energy Company. (cjs) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#13

(#13) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (cjs) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Stock on behalf of Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Stock, Robert) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#11

(#11) SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to QEP Energy Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/30/2020. (cjs) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

10 #1

Exhibit A: Consent to Removal by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.

#10

(#10) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by QEP Energy Company from Dunn County District Court filed by QEP Energy Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent to Removal by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.)(js) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#9

(#9) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Sean A. Granville. (js) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by QEP Energy Company. (Hughes, John) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Hughes on behalf of QEP Energy Company (Hughes, John) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by QEP Energy Company identifying Corporate Parent QEP Resources, Inc. for QEP Energy Company.. (Hughes, John) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to QEP Energy Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/16/2020. (cjs) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Sean A. Granville. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/16/2020. (cjs) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit 1-Summons, Complaint and Demand for Jury

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by QEP Energy Company. (cjs) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • Docket(#14) (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel M. Traynor, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge. (cjs) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (cjs) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Stock on behalf of Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Stock, Robert) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to QEP Energy Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/30/2020. (cjs) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 NOTICE (Other). Wrong event selected. Clerks office restricted access to document and re-filed as AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL at #10 . (js) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by QEP Energy Company from Dunn County District Court filed by QEP Energy Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent to Removal by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.)(js) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET CORRECTION re: #7 Administration Record. Wrong event selected. Clerks office restricted access to document and re-filed as CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM at #9 . (js) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* NOTICE by QEP Energy Company of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent to Removal by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.)(Hughes, John) Modified on 6/15/2020 to restrict access. (js) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Sean A. Granville. (js) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* Administrative Record by Sean A. Granville re #2 Notice of Direct Assignment. (Weikum, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/11/2020 to restrict access. (js) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by QEP Energy Company. (Hughes, John) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Hughes on behalf of QEP Energy Company (Hughes, John) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by QEP Energy Company identifying Corporate Parent QEP Resources, Inc. for QEP Energy Company.. (Hughes, John) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to QEP Energy Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/16/2020. (cjs) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Sean A. Granville. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/16/2020. (cjs) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by QEP Energy Company from Dunn County District Court, no case number assigned. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 120000751 filed by QEP Energy Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-Summons, Complaint and Demand for Jury)(cjs) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less