This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/13/2022 at 09:37:54 (UTC).

Grant v. American Modern Select Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/15/2021 Grant filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American Modern Select Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are CJ Williams and Mark A Roberts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00160

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CJ Williams

Referral Judge

Mark A Roberts

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rebecca A. Grant

Rebecca A Grant

Defendant

American Modern Select Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory Thomas Usher

Attorney at Nazette Marner Nathanson & Shea LLP

615 2Nd Street Sw, 52404

Cedar Rapids, IA 52404

Defendant Attorney

Benjamin M Weston

Attorney at Lederer Weston & Craig PLC

4401 Westown Parkway, Suite 212

West Des Moines, IA 50266

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Linn County District Court, case number LACV098175. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3584938), filed by American Modern Select Insurance Company. Scheduling Report due by 2/14/2022 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Local Rule 81.A Statement) (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

State Court Pleadings

1 #3

Local Rule 81.A Statement

#2

(#2) STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Rebecca A Grant (klh) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#3

(#3) AMENDED STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Rebecca A Grant (klh) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#4

(#4) DOCKET Annotation: Please find Civil Removal Actions new case packet attached (klh) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER With Jury Demand to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by American Modern Select Insurance Company.(Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by American Modern Select Insurance Company (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by American Modern Select Insurance Company (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER With Jury Demand to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by American Modern Select Insurance Company.(Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketSet Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 1/6/2022 (klh) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DOCKET Annotation: Please find Civil Removal Actions new case packet attached (klh) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Rebecca A Grant (klh) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Rebecca A Grant (klh) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketJudge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. no conflicts identified. (klh) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Linn County District Court, case number LACV098175. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3584938), filed by American Modern Select Insurance Company. Scheduling Report due by 2/14/2022 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Local Rule 81.A Statement) (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN MODERN SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Michael Weston