This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/31/2020 at 08:43:45 (UTC).

Grant et al v. Trump et al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 Grant filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Trump. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John G. Koeltl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-07103

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John G. Koeltl

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Greenheart Music Limited

Edmond Grant

Defendants

Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.

Donald J. Trump

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian D. Caplan

Attorney at Reitler Kailas & Rosenblatt, L.L.C.

885 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10022-7604

Robert William Clarida

Attorney at Reitler Kailas & Rosenblatt, L.L.C.

885 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10022-7604

Julie B. Wlodinguer

Attorney at Reitler Kailas & Rosenblatt, L.L.C.

885 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10022-7604

Defendant Attorney

Kenneth Andrew Caruso

Attorney at Mukasey Frenchman & Sklaroff LLP

2 Grand Central Tower, 140 East 45Th Street, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit C - August 13, 2020 Letter

1 #2

Exhibit B - SR Copyright Registration

1 #1

Exhibit A - PA Copyright Registration

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Donald J. Trump For President, Inc. waiver sent on 9/14/2020, answer due 11/13/2020. Document filed by Greenheart Music Limited(an Antigua and Barbuda Limited Company); Edmond Grant; Greenheart Music Limited(a United Kingdom Limited Company)..(Wlodinguer, Julie) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Donald J. Trump waiver sent on 9/14/2020, answer due 11/13/2020. Document filed by Greenheart Music Limited(an Antigua and Barbuda Limited Company); Edmond Grant; Greenheart Music Limited(a United Kingdom Limited Company)..(Wlodinguer, Julie) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Andrew Caruso on behalf of Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Donald J. Trump..(Caruso, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(jgo) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Donald J. Trump..(jgo) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Donald J. Trump For President, Inc...(jgo) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brian D. Caplan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand none; County code XX Out of State;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $300,000; the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert William Clarida on behalf of Edmond Grant, Greenheart Music Limited(an Antigua and Barbuda Limited Company), Greenheart Music Limited(a United Kingdom Limited Company)..(Clarida, Robert) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julie B. Wlodinguer on behalf of Edmond Grant, Greenheart Music Limited(an Antigua and Barbuda Limited Company), Greenheart Music Limited(a United Kingdom Limited Company)..(Wlodinguer, Julie) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Edmond Grant, Greenheart Music Limited(an Antigua and Barbuda Limited Company), Greenheart Music Limited(a United Kingdom Limited Company)..(Caplan, Brian) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Donald J. Trump, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Edmond Grant, Greenheart Music Limited(an Antigua and Barbuda Limited Company), Greenheart Music Limited(a United Kingdom Limited Company)..(Caplan, Brian) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Caplan, Brian) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Greenheart Music Limited(an Antigua and Barbuda Limited Company), Greenheart Music Limited(a United Kingdom Limited Company)..(Caplan, Brian) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Caplan, Brian) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Donald J. Trump. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21424579)Document filed by Greenheart Music Limited(an Antigua and Barbuda Limited Company), Edmond Grant, Greenheart Music Limited(a United Kingdom Limited Company). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PA Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit B - SR Copyright Registration, #3 Exhibit C - August 13, 2020 Letter).(Caplan, Brian) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert W. Clarida

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julie B. Wlodinguer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian D. Caplan