This case was last updated from PACER on 03/13/2020 at 07:56:18 (UTC).

Grant, et al. v. Sanofi US Services Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 Grant filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Sanofi US Services Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Triche Milazzo and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00115

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Triche Milazzo

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carol Grant

Rick Grant

Defendants

Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.

McKesson Corporation

Sandoz, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Hospira, Inc.

Pfizer Inc.

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Accord Healthcare, Inc.

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc

Sun Pharma Global FZE

Hospira Worldwide, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sean C. Domnick

Attorney at Domnick Cunningham & Whalen

2401 Pga Blvd., Suite 140

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8080308) filed by Carol Grant and Rick Grant. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons) Attorney Sean C. Domnick added to party Carol Grant(pty:pla).(Domnick, Sean) Attorney Sean C. Domnick added to party Carol Grant(pty:pla).(Domnick, Sean) Modified text on 1/15/2020 (ss). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#5

(#5) PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(am) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

1 #6

Summons

1 #12

Summons

1 #7

Summons

1 #9

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(ss) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

3 #10

Summons

1 #10

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #11

Summons

1 #13

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #11

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #8

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #4

Summons

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(am) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Page 2 of summons not provided. For future filings, page 2 should be attached to page 1 of summons. Clerk has attached 2nd page of summons. Please use both pages when filing returns of service. No further action necessary.** (ss) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(ss) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8080308) filed by Carol Grant and Rick Grant. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons) Attorney Sean C. Domnick added to party Carol Grant(pty:pla).(Domnick, Sean) Attorney Sean C. Domnick added to party Carol Grant(pty:pla).(Domnick, Sean) Modified text on 1/15/2020 (ss). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.