This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:48:18 (UTC).

Grange Hotels Group v. TravelCLICK, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Grange Hotels Group filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TravelCLICK, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Z. Lee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03355

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Z. Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Grange Hotels Group

Defendant

TravelCLICK, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian Alan Sher

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

161 North Clark, #4300

Chicago, IL 60601-3206

Lauren Jennifer Caisman

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

161 North Clark Street, Suite 4300

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Motion by Lauren Jennifer Caisman for presentment of motion for leave to file #6 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 5/23/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Grange Hotels Group (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Grange Hotels Group by Lauren Jennifer Caisman (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment filed by Grange Hotels Group; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15840262. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Correspondence)(Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#15

(#15) STATUS Report (Joint) by Grange Hotels Group (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#14

(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Grange Hotels Group. TravelCLICK, Inc. waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Agreement

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Correspondence

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligation Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Sher, Brian) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Grange Hotels Group by Brian Alan Sher (Sher, Brian) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Grange Hotels Group for leave to file Exhibit A to Complaint Under Seal (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#13

(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion for leave to file exhibit A under seal #6 is granted. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#10

(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 7/17/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under MIDPP (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) STATUS Report (Joint) by Grange Hotels Group (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Grange Hotels Group. TravelCLICK, Inc. waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion for leave to file exhibit A under seal #6 is granted. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CERTIFICATE Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligation Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Sher, Brian) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CERTIFICATE Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under MIDPP (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 7/17/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Grange Hotels Group (Exhibit A to Complaint) regarding complaint #1 (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Motion by Lauren Jennifer Caisman for presentment of motion for leave to file #6 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 5/23/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Grange Hotels Group for leave to file Exhibit A to Complaint Under Seal (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Grange Hotels Group by Brian Alan Sher (Sher, Brian) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Grange Hotels Group (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Grange Hotels Group by Lauren Jennifer Caisman (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment filed by Grange Hotels Group; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15840262. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Correspondence)(Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.