This case was last updated from PACER on 03/12/2021 at 12:37:06 (UTC).

Grandinetti v. Tresch et al

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 Grandinetti filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Tresch. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are ROM TRADER and LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00032

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

ROM TRADER

Presiding Judge

LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Francis Grandinetti

Aiea, HI 96701

Francis Anthony Grandinetti, II

Aiea, HI 96701

Defendants

M. Bala

M. Feldt

Dr. Maura Tresch

DPS-HI

Lt. Governor Josh Green

Wes Mun

Dr. Deane Hatakeyama

Dr. Austin Whiting

Governor David Ige

Dr. Carole Mee

Dr. Mau

M. Ah Quin

M. Momii

Tina Agaran

Dr. Ravi

Interested Parties

Laurie Nadamoto

Shelley Harrington

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Mailing Documentation

#7

(#7) Subsequent NOTICE OF APPEAL re #2 , #3 - by Francis Grandinetti. Filing fee $ DUE. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) (Entered: 02/13/2021)

6 #1

Mailing Documentation

#6

(#6) Proof of Service - by Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) (Entered: 02/13/2021)

#5

(#5) USCA Case Number 21-15215 for #4 Notice of Appeal filed by Francis Grandinetti : This appeal is subject to a pre-filing review order entered in case number 06-80108. The appeal will be reviewed by the Court to determine whether it will be permitted to proceed. Do not file a brief until/unless directed by the Court to do so. Briefing schedule will be set by future court order only if the Court determines that the appeal should be allowed to proceed. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti, II served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on February 9, 2021. (Entered: 02/09/2021)

4 #1

Mailing Documentation

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF APPEAL re #2 , #3 - by Francis Grandinetti. Filing fee $ DUE. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#3

(#3) CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 1/15/2021 pursuant to ECF No. #2 DISMISSAL ORDER. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on January 19, 2021. (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#2

(#2) DISMISSAL ORDER re #1 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 1/15/2021. The Court construes Grandinetti's filing of this action without paying the civil filing fee as an informal request to proceed in forma pauperis. So construed, the request is DENIED, and this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. This does not prevent Grandinetti from raising his claims in a new action with concurrent payment of the civil filing fee. Because the action is dismissed, any request for a preliminary injunction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) is DENIED as moot. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate this case. The Court will take no action on documents filed herein beyond processing a notice of appeal. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on January 19, 2021. (Entered: 01/15/2021)

1 #1

Mailing Documentation

#1

(#1) FEDRAL COMPLAINT of Denial of Medical and M.H. Services during COVID Shutdown at Halawa against All Defendants - filed by Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Subsequent NOTICE OF APPEAL re #2 , #3 - by Francis Grandinetti. Filing fee $ DUE. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) (Entered: 02/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proof of Service - by Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) (Entered: 02/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) USCA Case Number 21-15215 for #4 Notice of Appeal filed by Francis Grandinetti : This appeal is subject to a pre-filing review order entered in case number 06-80108. The appeal will be reviewed by the Court to determine whether it will be permitted to proceed. Do not file a brief until/unless directed by the Court to do so. Briefing schedule will be set by future court order only if the Court determines that the appeal should be allowed to proceed. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti, II served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on February 9, 2021. (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEAL re #2 , #3 - by Francis Grandinetti. Filing fee $ DUE. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 1/15/2021 pursuant to ECF No. #2 DISMISSAL ORDER. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on January 19, 2021. (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISMISSAL ORDER re #1 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 1/15/2021. The Court construes Grandinetti's filing of this action without paying the civil filing fee as an informal request to proceed in forma pauperis. So construed, the request is DENIED, and this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. This does not prevent Grandinetti from raising his claims in a new action with concurrent payment of the civil filing fee. Because the action is dismissed, any request for a preliminary injunction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) is DENIED as moot. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate this case. The Court will take no action on documents filed herein beyond processing a notice of appeal. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on January 19, 2021. (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FEDRAL COMPLAINT of Denial of Medical and M.H. Services during COVID Shutdown at Halawa against All Defendants - filed by Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DPS-HI is a litigant

Latest cases where Dr. Mau is a litigant

Latest cases where Lt. Governor Josh Green is a litigant