This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/14/2021 at 11:12:39 (UTC).

Grandinetti v. Ravi et al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 Grandinetti filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Ravi. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are ROM TRADER and JILL A. OTAKE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00138

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

ROM TRADER

Presiding Judge

JILL A. OTAKE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Francis Grandinetti

Aiea, HI 96701

Francis Anthony Grandinetti, II

Aiea, HI 96701

Defendants

Jacob Toquado

Max N. Otani

Flow

Dr. A. Whiting

Dr. Caroline Mee

Dr. Ravi

Brandon Kajima

Dr. Mau

Interested Parties

Shelley Harrington

Laurie Nadamoto

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Pro Se Plaintiff's Written Objections to IFP Ledger, HMSF (J. Fujita, Authorized Officer, Halawa Correctional Facility) - by Plaintiff Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER DENYING SECOND APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS BY A PRISONER re #12 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 5/4/2021. Failure to pay the filing fee or submit a complete application on or before June 3, 2021, will result in automatic dismissal of this suit without prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b); see also Olivares v. Marshall, 59 F.3d 109, 112 (9th Cir. 1995). The Court will take no action on any pending or future filings in this action until Grandinetti pays the filing fee or is granted IFP status. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Grandinetti an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner so that he can comply with this Order. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on May 5, 2021. A blank Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner shall be included in the mailing to Plaintiff. (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner - by Plaintiff Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE re #8 - filed by Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(jni) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) USCA Case Number 21-15798 for #9 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Francis Grandinetti. COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)(jni) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL ("Consolidated Appeals") - by Francis Grandinetti. Filing fee $ DUE. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) Docket Text Modified on 5/3/2021 (jni) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS BY A PRISONER re #5 , #6 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 4/21/2021. Grandinetti is DIRECTED to submit a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner that also includes: (1) certification by prison officials of the amount currently in his prison account; (2) an account statement for the preceding six months showing all deposits and withdrawals to Grandinetti's account during that period; and (3) Grandinetti's consent to the withdrawal of funds from his account. Failure to pay the filing fee or submit a complete application on or before May 19, 2021, will result in automatic dismissal of this suit without prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b); see also Olivares v. Marshall, 59 F.3d 109, 112 (9th Cir. 1995). The Court will take no action on any pending or future filings in this action until Grandinetti pays the filing fee or is granted IFP status. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Grandinetti an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner so that he can comply with this Order. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on April 22, 2021. A blank Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner shall be included in the mailing to Plaintiff. (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Pro Se Plaintiff on Renewed TRO, FRCP 65 Motion, and 28 U.S.C. 1915 (g) Remedies, before the April 14, 2021 Deadline for Court Order - by Plaintiff Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner - by Plaintiff Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket(#4) EO: On March 17, 2021, the Court issued [ECF No. 2] a Deficiency Order granting Plaintiff until April 14, 2021, either to pay the $402.00 filing fee or submit a completed and executed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner. Before the Court is Plaintiff's [ECF No. 3] motion to "Enlarge/postpone IFP deadline to May 14, 2021." The motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff is GRANTED until May 14, 2021, either to pay the $402.00 filing fee or submit a completed and executed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner. The application must bear the docket number assigned to this case. Failure to timely file an in forma pauperis application or the statutory filing fee by May 14, 2021, will result in AUTOMATIC DISMISSAL of this action. At the same time, Plaintiff must resubmit his claims on the court's approved Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint form. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Enlarge/Postpone IFP Deadline to May 14, 2021 - by Plaintiff Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 3/17/2021. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff one copy each of the Court's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner and Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint form. 2. Plaintiff is GRANTED until April 14, 2021 to either pay the $402.00 filing fee or submit a completed and executed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner. The application must bear the docket number assigned to this case. Failure to timely file an in forma pauperis application or the statutory filing fee by April 14, 2021 will result in AUTOMATIC DISMISSAL of this action. 3. At the same time, Plaintiff must resubmit his claims on the Court's approved Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint form. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on March 18, 2021. A blank Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner form, blank Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint form and instructions shall be included in the mailing to Plaintiff. (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Federal COMPLAINT and TRO Motion against All Defendants - filed by Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dr. Ravi is a litigant