This case was last updated from PACER on 03/12/2021 at 12:37:44 (UTC).

Grandinetti v. National Guard et al

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 Grandinetti filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against National Guard. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are DERRICK K. WATSON and ROM TRADER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00037

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DERRICK K. WATSON

Referral Judge

ROM TRADER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Francis Grandinetti

Aiea, HI 96701

Frank Grandinetti

Aiea, HI 96701

Francis Anthony Grandinetti, II

Aiea, HI 96701

Defendants

Department of Health (DOH)

Lt. Governor Josh Green

Honolulu Fire Department

U.S. Department of Justice

Jerome Adams

U.S. Marshals

FLASH Security Services

Airport Staff

Emergency Medical Services Department

C&C of Honolulu

Governor David Yutaka Ige

FBI

U.S. Department of Defense

President, USA Donald J. Trump

Attorney General

National Guard

Interested Party

Laurie Nadamoto

6 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Mailing Documentation

#6

(#6) SUPPLEMENT (Preliminary Injunction Appeal Relief) re #4 Notice of Appeal - by Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) (Entered: 02/13/2021)

#5

(#5) USCA Case Number 21-15216 for #4 Notice of Appeal filed by Francis Grandinetti: This appeal is subject to a pre-filing review order entered in case number 06-80108. The appeal will be reviewed by the Court to determine whether it will be permitted to proceed. Do not file a brief until/unless directed by the Court to do so. Briefing schedule will be set by future court order only if the Court determines that the appeal should be allowed to proceed. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on February 9, 2021. (Entered: 02/09/2021)

4 #1

Mailing Documentation

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF APPEAL (FRAP 8: Preliminary Injunction Appeal) re #2 , #3 - by Francis Grandinetti. Filing fee $ DUE. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#3

(#3) CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 1/15/2021 pursuant to ECF No. #2 " DISMISSAL ORDER". (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on January 19, 2021. (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#2

(#2) DISMISSAL ORDER re #1 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 1/15/2021. The Court construes Grandinetti's filing of this action without paying the civil filing fee as an informal request to proceed in forma pauperis. So construed, the request is DENIED for the reasons set forth above, and this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. This does not prevent Grandinetti from raising his claims in a new action with concurrent payment of the civil filing fee. To the extent Grandinetti seeks a preliminary injunction under Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a), that request is DENIED as moot. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate this case. The Court will take no action on any other documents filed herein beyond processing a notice of appeal. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on January 19, 2021. (Entered: 01/15/2021)

1 #1

Mailing Documentation

#1

(#1) FEDERAL COMPLAINT and Preliminary Injunction Application (FRCP 65) against All Defendants - filed by Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUPPLEMENT (Preliminary Injunction Appeal Relief) re #4 Notice of Appeal - by Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) (Entered: 02/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) USCA Case Number 21-15216 for #4 Notice of Appeal filed by Francis Grandinetti: This appeal is subject to a pre-filing review order entered in case number 06-80108. The appeal will be reviewed by the Court to determine whether it will be permitted to proceed. Do not file a brief until/unless directed by the Court to do so. Briefing schedule will be set by future court order only if the Court determines that the appeal should be allowed to proceed. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on February 9, 2021. (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEAL (FRAP 8: Preliminary Injunction Appeal) re #2 , #3 - by Francis Grandinetti. Filing fee $ DUE. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 1/15/2021 pursuant to ECF No. #2 " DISMISSAL ORDER". (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on January 19, 2021. (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISMISSAL ORDER re #1 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 1/15/2021. The Court construes Grandinetti's filing of this action without paying the civil filing fee as an informal request to proceed in forma pauperis. So construed, the request is DENIED for the reasons set forth above, and this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. This does not prevent Grandinetti from raising his claims in a new action with concurrent payment of the civil filing fee. To the extent Grandinetti seeks a preliminary injunction under Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a), that request is DENIED as moot. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate this case. The Court will take no action on any other documents filed herein beyond processing a notice of appeal. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on January 19, 2021. (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FEDERAL COMPLAINT and Preliminary Injunction Application (FRCP 65) against All Defendants - filed by Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C&C of Honolulu is a litigant

Latest cases where National Guard is a litigant

Latest cases where Lt. Governor Josh Green is a litigant