This case was last updated from PACER on 01/29/2021 at 11:32:44 (UTC).

Grandinetti v. Kaplan et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 Grandinetti filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Kaplan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are ROM TRADER and LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00522

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

ROM TRADER

Presiding Judge

LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Francis Grandinetti

Aiea, HI 96701

Francis Anthony Grandinetti, II

Aiea, HI 96701

Defendants

Lyle Antonio

Lt. Governor Josh Green

All Public Safety Directors and Deputy Directors

Eric Penarosa

Nolan Espinda

Guy Hall

Scott Harrington

Governor David Ige

Mr. Gary B. Kaplan

All HCF, OCCC, HCCC, and DPS employees

Trans-Cor America

William Oku

Intake Service Centers

CoreCivic

Corrections Corporation of America

Interested Parties

Laurie Nadamoto

Shelley Harrington

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Mailing Documentation

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF APPEAL re #2 , #3 - by Francis Grandinetti. Filing fee $ DUE. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

#3

(#3) CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 12/2/2020 pursuant to ECF No. #2 DISMISSAL ORDER. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on December 3, 2020. (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#2

(#2) DISMISSAL ORDER re #1 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 12/2/2020. The Court construes Grandinetti's filing of this action without paying the civil filing fee as an informal request to proceed in forma pauperis. So construed, the request is DENIED, and this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. This does not prevent Grandinetti from raising his claims in a new action with concurrent payment of the civil filing fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate this case. The Court will take no action on documents filed herein beyond processing a notice of appeal. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on December 3, 2020. (Entered: 12/02/2020)

1 #1

Mailing Documentation

#1

(#1) FEDERAL COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEAL re #2 , #3 - by Francis Grandinetti. Filing fee $ DUE. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 12/2/2020 pursuant to ECF No. #2 DISMISSAL ORDER. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on December 3, 2020. (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISMISSAL ORDER re #1 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 12/2/2020. The Court construes Grandinetti's filing of this action without paying the civil filing fee as an informal request to proceed in forma pauperis. So construed, the request is DENIED, and this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. This does not prevent Grandinetti from raising his claims in a new action with concurrent payment of the civil filing fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate this case. The Court will take no action on documents filed herein beyond processing a notice of appeal. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on December 3, 2020. (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FEDERAL COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lt. Governor Josh Green is a litigant

Latest cases where Governor David Ige is a litigant

Latest cases where Corrections Corporation of America is a litigant

Latest cases where CoreCivic, Inc. is a litigant