This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/18/2021 at 10:11:06 (UTC).

GRAMMER v. WRIGHT OF INDIANA, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 GRAMMER filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against WRIGHT OF INDIANA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra McVicker Lynch and James Patrick Hanlon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03041

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra McVicker Lynch

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LONNIE J. GRAMMER

Defendant

WRIGHT OF INDIANA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aaron J. Williamson

Attorney at WILLIAMSON CIVIL LAW, LLC

8888 Keystone Crossing, Suite 1300

Indianapolis, IN 46240

Robert Peter Kondras, Jr.

Attorney at HASSLER KONDRAS MILLER LLP

100 Cherry Street

Terre Haute, IN 47807

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Michalski

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON PC

625 Liberty Ave, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Emily L. Connor

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 702

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

22 #1

Exhibit

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff in a Collective Action Under the FLSA for Wyatt Baker filed by LONNIE J. GRAMMER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#21

(#21) SECOND AMENDED COMBINED CLASS ACTION AND FLSA COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT for DAMAGES against WRIGHT OF INDIANA, LLC, filed by LONNIE J. GRAMMER (Ordered filed this date)(CBU) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#20

(#20) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File the Second Amended Complaint. The Court directs the Clerk to docket the Second Amended Complaint at Dkt. 17-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/11/2021. (CBU) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#18

(#18) ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint , filed by WRIGHT OF INDIANA, LLC.(Connor, Emily) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

17 #2

Text of Proposed Order

17 #1

Exhibit 1 - Proposed Second Amended Complaint

#17

(#17) MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Class and FLSA Collective Action Complaint, filed by Plaintiff LONNIE J. GRAMMER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#13

(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT against WRIGHT OF INDIANA, LLC, filed by LONNIE J. GRAMMER.(Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

6 #1

Exhibit

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff in a Collective Action Under the FLSA by LONNIE J. GRAMMER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to WRIGHT OF INDIANA, LLC. (DJH) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron J. Williamson on behalf of Plaintiff LONNIE J. GRAMMER. (Williamson, Aaron) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Peter Kondras, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff LONNIE J. GRAMMER. (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against WRIGHT OF INDIANA, LLC, filed by LONNIE J. GRAMMER. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6284863) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff in a Collective Action Under the FLSA for Wyatt Baker filed by LONNIE J. GRAMMER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SECOND AMENDED COMBINED CLASS ACTION AND FLSA COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT for DAMAGES against WRIGHT OF INDIANA, LLC, filed by LONNIE J. GRAMMER (Ordered filed this date)(CBU) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File the Second Amended Complaint. The Court directs the Clerk to docket the Second Amended Complaint at Dkt. 17-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/11/2021. (CBU) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint , filed by WRIGHT OF INDIANA, LLC.(Connor, Emily) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Class and FLSA Collective Action Complaint, filed by Plaintiff LONNIE J. GRAMMER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff LONNIE J. GRAMMER . (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Christopher Michalski for WRIGHT OF INDIANA, LLC added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/23/2020 Copy sent to Attorney Michalski via US Mail (CBU) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Attorney(s) Christopher Michalski to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6335959), filed by Defendant WRIGHT OF INDIANA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Certification of Christopher Michalski in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Connor, Emily) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT against WRIGHT OF INDIANA, LLC, filed by LONNIE J. GRAMMER.(Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Order Setting Initial Pretrial Conference - This case is assigned for an initial pretrial conference on January 13, 2021, at 2:00 p.m. (Eastern Time), before United States Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. (See Order.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/11/2020. (NAD) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Automatic Initial Extension of Time, filed by Defendant WRIGHT OF INDIANA, LLC (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L. Connor on behalf of Defendant WRIGHT OF INDIANA, LLC. (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of Service, filed by LONNIE J. GRAMMER. WRIGHT OF INDIANA, LLC served on 11/23/2020. (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff in a Collective Action Under the FLSA by LONNIE J. GRAMMER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to WRIGHT OF INDIANA, LLC. (DJH) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron J. Williamson on behalf of Plaintiff LONNIE J. GRAMMER. (Williamson, Aaron) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Peter Kondras, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff LONNIE J. GRAMMER. (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against WRIGHT OF INDIANA, LLC, filed by LONNIE J. GRAMMER. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6284863) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron J Williamson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Peter Kondras, Jr.