This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/13/2020 at 11:06:18 (UTC).

GRAHAM v. TRIUMPH AEROSTRUCTURES, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 GRAHAM filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against TRIUMPH AEROSTRUCTURES, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robin L. Rosenberg and Shaniek M. Maynard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-14241

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

Referral Judge

Shaniek M. Maynard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATTHEW GRAHAM

Defendant

TRIUMPH AEROSTRUCTURES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Noah E Storch

Attorney at Celler Legal, P.A.

10368 West State Road 84, Suite 103

Davie, FL 33324

Alexander Thomas Harne

Attorney at Richard Celler Legal, P.A.

10368 West State Road 84, #103

Davie, FL 33324

Defendant Attorney

Jennifer Monrose Moore

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart PC

100 North Tampa Street, Suite 3600

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Exhibit 1

#14

#13

12 #1

Exhibit 1

#12

#11

#10

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by MATTHEW GRAHAM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Harne, Alexander) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Striking #12 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1 filed by MATTHEW GRAHAM by MATTHEW GRAHAM (Harne, Alexander) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) **STRICKEN** Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by MATTHEW GRAHAM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Harne, Alexander) Text Modified on 8/28/2020 per DE #13 NOTICE OF STRIKING (ail). (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by TRIUMPH AEROSTRUCTURES, LLC. (Moore, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 8/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's response to #1 Complaint is due on or before 8/21/2020. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/5/2020. (hhn) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by TRIUMPH AEROSTRUCTURES, LLC. (Moore, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Monrose Moore on behalf of TRIUMPH AEROSTRUCTURES, LLC. Attorney Jennifer Monrose Moore added to party TRIUMPH AEROSTRUCTURES, LLC(pty:dft). (Moore, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 7/19/2021 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 7/14/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 6/16/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard for Discovery Matters. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard no longer assigned as presider/referral judge(s) in case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Thomas Harne on behalf of MATTHEW GRAHAM. Attorney Alexander Thomas Harne added to party MATTHEW GRAHAM(pty:pla). (Harne, Alexander) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MATTHEW GRAHAM. TRIUMPH AEROSTRUCTURES, LLC served on 7/17/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to TRIUMPH AEROSTRUCTURES, LLC. (amb) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against TRIUMPH AEROSTRUCTURES, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13185133, filed by MATTHEW GRAHAM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Storch, Noah) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRIUMPH AEROSTRUCTURES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENNIFER MONROSE MOORE