This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/28/2021 at 07:33:32 (UTC).

Graham v. Stuffed Za LLC

Case Summary

On 10/29/2021 Graham filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Stuffed Za LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Damon R Leichty and Susan L Collins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00408

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Damon R Leichty

Referral Judge

Susan L Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRANDON GRAHAM

Defendants

STUFFED ZA LLC dba GIORDANO'S

Stuffed Za LLC doing business as Giordano's

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer L Hitchcock

Attorney at Law Office of Jennifer L Hitchcock

116 E Berry St Ste 625

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Michael R Middleton

Attorney at Law Office of Jennifer L Hitchcock

116 E Berry St Ste 625

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Defendant Attorneys

Theodore T Storer

Attorney at Beers Mallers Backs & Salin LLP - FW/IN

110 W Berry St Ste 1100

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Christina M Kamelhair

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC - Ind/IN

111 Monument Cir Ste 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Phillip J Jones

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC - Ind/IN

111 Monument Cir Ste 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4731744.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D02-2109-CT-512, filed by STUFFED ZA LLC dba GIORDANO'S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Storer, Theodore) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore T Storer on behalf of STUFFED ZA LLC dba GIORDANO'S (Storer, Theodore) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Stuffed Za LLC Automatic Enlargement of Time (Storer, Theodore) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2021 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#6

(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M Kamelhair on behalf of Stuffed Za LLC (Kamelhair, Christina) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip J Jones on behalf of Stuffed Za LLC (Jones, Phillip) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stuffed Za LLC. (Kamelhair, Christina) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference (Unopposed) by Defendant Stuffed Za LLC. (Kamelhair, Christina) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Stuffed Za LLC. (Storer, Theodore) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R Middleton on behalf of Brandon Graham (Middleton, Michael) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#15

(#15) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Stuffed Za LLC.(Kamelhair, Christina) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Stuffed Za LLC.(Kamelhair, Christina) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R Middleton on behalf of Brandon Graham (Middleton, Michael) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The #12 Motion to Withdraw Appearance is granted. The appearance of Attorney Theodore T Storer is hereby withdrawn on behalf of Dft. Text entry order.(mr) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Stuffed Za LLC. (Storer, Theodore) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: #10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer Complaint and Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference is granted. The deadline for Defendant to file an Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to and including 12/17/2021. The telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2021 at 10:30 am is VACATED and RESET for 1/5/2022 at 10:30 am. Court to initiate call. Text entry order.(mr) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference (Unopposed) by Defendant Stuffed Za LLC. (Kamelhair, Christina) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stuffed Za LLC. (Kamelhair, Christina) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip J Jones on behalf of Stuffed Za LLC (Jones, Phillip) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M Kamelhair on behalf of Stuffed Za LLC (Kamelhair, Christina) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2021 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings: per #4 Stuffed Za LLC answer due 12/3/2021. (rmc) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Stuffed Za LLC Automatic Enlargement of Time (Storer, Theodore) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • Docket**NEW CASE** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (nhc) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore T Storer on behalf of STUFFED ZA LLC dba GIORDANO'S (Storer, Theodore) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4731744.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D02-2109-CT-512, filed by STUFFED ZA LLC dba GIORDANO'S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Storer, Theodore) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phillip Jeffrey Jones

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christina M. Kamelhair

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Theodore T Storer