Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/29/2021 at 10:04:01 (UTC).

Graham v. Richelmon et al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 Graham filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Richelmon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Staci M. Yandle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00340

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Staci M. Yandle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cedrick J. Graham

Galesburg, IL 61402

Defendants

Counselor Tease

Mat Page

Nurse

John Does 8-12

Menard Employees

John Doe 7

Major Bochoutus

John Doe 3

John Doe 2

Gannon Richelmon

Wexford Health Source, Inc.

Correctional Officers

John Doe 5

Medical Staff

John Doe 4

John Doe 1

Brumley

John/Jane Doe 6

 

Court Documents

#8

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#5

(#5) NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff Cedrick J. Graham to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff Cedrick J. Graham on 03/30/2021. Consent due by 4/20/2021 (kare) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cedrick J. Graham. (kare) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel by Cedrick J. Graham. (kare) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cedrick J. Graham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(kare) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT/REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, this case will remain with the assigned District Judge Staci M. Yandle. This Notice does not alter any prior referrals of motions or matters pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(b)(1-3). (kare)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (kare) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketInitial Prisoner Filing Fee: $ 27.55 received, receipt number 34625107566 (amv) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (Doc. #3 ). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $27.55. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court upon receipt of this Order. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid.In addition, Plaintiff shall note that the filing fees for multiple cases cumulate. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 436 (7th Cir. 1997), overruled in part on other grounds by Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000); Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626 (7th Cir. 2000). A prisoner who files one suit must remit 20% of his monthly income to the Clerk of the Court until his fees have been paid; a prisoner who files a second suit or an appeal must remit 40%; and so on. Newlin, 123 F.3d at 436. "Five suits or appeals mean that the prisoner's entire monthly income must be turned over to the court until the fees have been paid." Id. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at the Hill Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/5/2021. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Recruitment of Counsel (Doc. #2 ) is DENIED. The Court generally will not consider recruiting counsel for a pro se plaintiff until the Court conducts a preliminary review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, which requires the Court to screen prisoner Complaints to filter out nonmeritorious claims. 28 U.S.C. 1915A(a). Civil litigants do not have a constitutional or statutory right to counsel. Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 649 (7th Cir. 2007). A district court considering an indigent plaintiff's request for counsel must first consider whether the plaintiff has made reasonable attempts to secure counsel on his own or been effectively precluded from doing so; and, if so, whether the difficulty of the case factually and legally exceeds his capacity as a layperson to present it. Id. at 654-655. Neither of these requirements is satisfied. Plaintiff has not demonstrated reasonable efforts to locate counsel on his own, and he identifies no significant impediments to self-representation. If Plaintiff's Complaint survives Section 1915A review, and he encounters difficulties in self-representation as this case proceeds, he may refile his motion seeking recruitment of counsel. If he chooses to renew his request, he should submit rejection letters from at least 3 attorneys to demonstrate that he has made reasonable efforts to obtain counsel on his own. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/31/2021. (ksp) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff Cedrick J. Graham to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff Cedrick J. Graham on 03/30/2021. Consent due by 4/20/2021 (kare) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 21-340-SMY. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See: 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case.. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/30/2021. (kare)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cedrick J. Graham. (kare) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel by Cedrick J. Graham. (kare) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cedrick J. Graham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(kare) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Correctional Officers is a litigant

Latest cases where MEDICAL STAFF is a litigant

Latest cases where Nurse is a litigant

Latest cases where Wexford Health Soures Inc. is a litigant