This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/04/2019 at 07:22:52 (UTC).

Graham v. Mentor Worldwide LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2019 Graham filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Mentor Worldwide LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Noelle C. Collins and Jean C. Hamilton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01637

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Noelle C. Collins

Jean C. Hamilton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diane Graham

Defendants

Mentor Worldwide LLC

St. Louis Cosmetic Surgery, Inc.

Amy Haley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James P. Krupp

Attorney at KRUPP LAW FIRM, LLC

12813 Flushing Meadows Drive, Suite 150

St. Louis, MO 63131

Defendant Attorneys

Caroline M. Tinsley

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS LLP

100 S. 4Th St., Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63102

Cicely I. Lubben

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS LLP

100 S. 4Th St., Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63102

Dustin B. Rawlin, I

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS LLP

950 Main Ave., Suite 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113

Joseph F. Callahan

Attorney at Brown & James, P.C.

800 Market Street, Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

Robert D. Rowland

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROUSE AND CARY

10733 Sunset Office Drive, Suite 410

St. Louis, MO 63127

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) ANSWER to Complaint : Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC's Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Petition by Mentor Worldwide LLC.(Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#29

(#29) ORDER OF REMAND - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Count III of this matter against Defendant Hale is hereby SEVERED and REMANDED to the Circuit Court of St. Louis County, State of Missouri.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 07/19/2019. (AAS) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#28

(#28) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Remand (ECF No. #12 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; that Plaintiffs Count III for Negligence against Defendant Hale is hereby severed and REMANDED to the Circuit Court for St. Louis County, an Order of Remand will be issued to accompany this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Count II for Strict Products Liability against Defendant St. Louis Cosmetic Surgery, Inc., is hereby DISMISSED; and that Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Petition by Defendant St. Louis Cosmetic Surgery, Inc., (ECF No. #10 ) is DENIED as moot.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Mentor World Wide LLCs Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Petition is DENIED.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 07/19/2019. (AAS) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#27

(#27) ENTRY of Appearance by Robert D. Rowland for Defendant Amy Haley. (Rowland, Robert) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#26

(#26) REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Case : Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Petition for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC. (Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#17

(#24) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Case : Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Petition for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiff Diane Graham. (Krupp, James) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#12

(#23) RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court Of St. Louis County, Missouri filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC. (Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

10 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#10

(#22) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss :Count II of Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Against Defendant St. Louis Cosmetic Surgery, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Diane Graham. (Krupp, James) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Caroline M. Tinsley for Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC.. (Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Original Filing Form

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st Judicial Circuit, St. Louis County, Missouri, case number 19SL-CC01441, with receipt number AMOEDC-7259377, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Mentor Worldwide LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ANSWER to Complaint : Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC's Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Petition by Mentor Worldwide LLC.(Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***REMARK Certified copied of Order #28 and #29 mailed to the Circuit Court of St. Louis County, State of Missouri. (AAS) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ORDER OF REMAND - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Count III of this matter against Defendant Hale is hereby SEVERED and REMANDED to the Circuit Court of St. Louis County, State of Missouri.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 07/19/2019. (AAS) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Remand (ECF No. #12 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; that Plaintiffs Count III for Negligence against Defendant Hale is hereby severed and REMANDED to the Circuit Court for St. Louis County, an Order of Remand will be issued to accompany this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Count II for Strict Products Liability against Defendant St. Louis Cosmetic Surgery, Inc., is hereby DISMISSED; and that Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Petition by Defendant St. Louis Cosmetic Surgery, Inc., (ECF No. #10 ) is DENIED as moot.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Mentor World Wide LLCs Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Petition is DENIED.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 07/19/2019. (AAS) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ENTRY of Appearance by Robert D. Rowland for Defendant Amy Haley. (Rowland, Robert) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Case : Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Petition for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC. (Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss :Count II of Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Defendant St. Louis Cosmetic Surgery, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to this Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's First Amended Petition filed by Defendant St. Louis Cosmetic Surgery, Inc.. (Callahan, Joseph) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Case : Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Petition for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiff Diane Graham. (Krupp, James) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court Of St. Louis County, Missouri filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC. (Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss :Count II of Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Against Defendant St. Louis Cosmetic Surgery, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Diane Graham. (Krupp, James) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph F. Callahan for Defendant St. Louis Cosmetic Surgery, Inc.. (Callahan, Joseph) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • (#8) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (JWD) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Amy Haley.(JWD) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) First Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Louis County Circuit Court, filed by Diane Graham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(JWD) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Louis County Circuit Court, filed by Diane Graham.(JWD) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Caroline M. Tinsley for Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC.. (Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st Judicial Circuit, St. Louis County, Missouri, case number 19SL-CC01441, with receipt number AMOEDC-7259377, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Mentor Worldwide LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James P. Krupp