This case was last updated from PACER on 04/02/2021 at 09:00:11 (UTC).

GRAHAM et al v. PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 GRAHAM filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia L. Dodge and Maureen P. Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00148

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Patricia L. Dodge

Maureen P. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ZACHARY R. GRAHAM

Waynesburg, PA 15370

KEVIN R. SHAY

Waynesburg, PA 15370

Defendants

COUNSELOR BEERS

SUPERINTENDENT MICHAEL ZAKEN

STATE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION GREENE

PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

GREENAWALT

UNIT MANAGER MS. SWARTZ

JOHN E. WETZEL

HEARING EXAMINER J. YODIS

 

Court Documents

22 #2

Envelope

22 #1

Proposed Order

#22

(#22) MOTION to Enforce the PA DOC to Provide Conjoined Law Library Time by ZACHARY R. GRAHAM. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (ma) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

19 #1

Envelope

#19

(#19) Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by KEVIN R. SHAY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ma) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

18 #2

Exhibit 2

18 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #12

Proposed Summons - Wetzel

1 #11

Proposed Summons - SCI Greene

1 #10

Proposed Summons - PA Dept. of Corrections

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

#1

(#3) ORDER denying #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ZACHARY R. GRAHAM, and KEVIN R. SHAY. Case is administratively closed. Plaintiffs may reopen this case if, by 3/8/2021, Plaintiffs remit the filing fee, or submit another motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis along with the required documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 2/8/2021. (mqe) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Enforce the PA DOC to Provide Conjoined Law Library Time by ZACHARY R. GRAHAM. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (ma) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by ZACHARY R. GRAHAM. (Attachments: #1 Blank copies of IFP and Authorization, #2 Envelope) (ma) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by KEVIN R. SHAY. (Attachments: #1 Blank copies of IFP and Authorization, #2 Envelope) (ma) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by KEVIN R. SHAY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ma) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) AMENDED COMPLAINT against BEERS, GREENAWALT, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, STATE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION GREENE, SWARTZ, JOHN E. WETZEL, J. YODIS, MICHAEL ZAKEN, filed by KEVIN R. SHAY, ZACHARY R. GRAHAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6 (No Exhibit 7 was attached), #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10) (ma) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER denying as moot #4 the earlier filed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, in light of the order entered this date, at ECF No. 15, granting the later filed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 3/5/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Kelly, Maureen) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket the Amended Complaint, ECF No. 10-2, on the docket, along with Exhibits 1-10, ECF Nos. 10-3 through 10-11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 3/5/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Kelly, Maureen) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly added. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge no longer assigned to case. (mao) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by KEVIN R. SHAY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 3/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Authorization Form) (mqe) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by KEVIN R. SHAY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ma) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint to Change Name of a Defendant in the #4 Proposed Amended Complaint by ZACHARY R. GRAHAM. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6 (no Exhibit 7 was attached), #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Envelope) (ma) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by ZACHARY R. GRAHAM. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ma) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by KEVIN R. SHAY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ma) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Remark: Memorandum of Law Relating to Penological Interests by ZACHARY R. GRAHAM, KEVIN R. SHAY (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ma) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary Restraining Order by ZACHARY R. GRAHAM, KEVIN R. SHAY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ma) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Remark: Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion for an Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary Restraining Order by ZACHARY R. GRAHAM, KEVIN R. SHAY (Motion has not been filed) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ma) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by ZACHARY R. GRAHAM, KEVIN R. SHAY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6 (no Exhibit 7 was attached), #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Envelope) (ma) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER denying #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ZACHARY R. GRAHAM, and KEVIN R. SHAY. Case is administratively closed. Plaintiffs may reopen this case if, by 3/8/2021, Plaintiffs remit the filing fee, or submit another motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis along with the required documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 2/8/2021. (mqe) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by ZACHARY R. GRAHAM. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ma) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ZACHARY R. GRAHAM, KEVIN R. SHAY. (Attachments: #1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Declaration of Zachary R. Graham, #9 Proposed Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #10 Proposed Summons - PA Dept. of Corrections, #11 Proposed Summons - SCI Greene, #12 Proposed Summons - Wetzel, #13 Proposed Summons - Zaken, #14 Proposed Summons - Swartz, #15 Proposed Summons - Beers, #16 Proposed Summons - Greenawalt, #17 Envelope) (ma) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS is a litigant