This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 07:53:40 (UTC).

Grafton County v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 Grafton County filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Purdue Pharma L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy Torresen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00332

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy Torresen

 

Party Details

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Mallinckrodt LLC

Actavis, Inc.

Insys Therapeutics, Inc.

Allergan PLC

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Cardinal Health, Inc.

Christopher Clough

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Watson Laboratories, Inc.

Cephalon, Inc.

Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.

The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.

Endo Health Solutions Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Christopher S. Manfred

Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Rose Marie Joly

Attorney at Sulloway & Hollis PLLC

9 Capitol St

Concord, NH 03301-1256

Mark Cheffo

Attorney at Dechert LLP

Three Bryant Park, 1095 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036-6797

W. Daniel Deane

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

900 Elm St, 14Th Flr

Manchester, NH 03101-2031

Brien T. O'Connor

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

800 Boylston St, Prudential Tower

Boston, MA 02199

Zachary Davis Bland

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

800 Boylston St.

Boston, MA 02199

Donna Welch

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis

300 N Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Deborah E. Barnard

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

10 St James Ave, 11Th Flr

Boston, MA 02116

Brian M. Quirk

Attorney at Preti Flaherty Beliveau Pachios LLP

57 N Main St, Po Box 1318

Concord, NH 03302-1318

Michael J. Connolly

Attorney at Hinckley Allen & Snyder

11 S Main St, Ste 400

Concord, NH 03301

Michael A. Delaney

Attorney at McLane Middleton

900 Elm St, Po Box 326

Manchester, NH 03105-0326

Christopher D. Hawkins

Attorney at Devine Millimet & Branch PA

111 Amherst St

Manchester, NH 03101

Russell F. Hilliard

Attorney at Upton & Hatfield LLP

159 Middle St

Portsmouth, NH 03801

Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr

Attorney at Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP

54 West Hubbard St, Ste 300

Chicago, IL 60610

Charles C Lifland

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

400 S Hope St

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Other Attorneys

Arnold Rosenblatt

Attorney at Cook Little Rosenblatt & Manson PLLC

1000 Elm St, 20Th Flr

Manchester, NH 03101

Robert J. Bonsignore

Attorney at Bonsignore Trial Lawyers PLLC

3771 Meadowcrest Dr

Las Vegas, NV 89121

Michele E. Kenney

Attorney at Pierce Atwood LLP

One New Hampshire Ave, Ste 350

Portsmouth, NH 03801

Jeffrey W. Moss

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

One Federal St

Boston, MA 02110-4104

Adam B. Pignatelli

Attorney at Rath Young & Pignatelli PA

One Capital Plz, Po Box 1500

Concord, NH 03302-1500

Blake M. Sutton

Attorney at Sutton Law Office

816 Elm St., Ste. 298

Manchester, NH 03101

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#48

(#48) PROCEDURAL NOTICE: Due to recusal of NH judges, case referred to the District of Maine. Original filings shall continue to be filed electronically with the Clerk in New Hampshire in accordance with the district Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants, however, are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. No courtesy filings need to be filed in the District of Maine. NOTICE Signed by Erica Jordan, Deputy Clerk. (ej) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#47

(#47) CONCURRING ORDER re: #45 Designated Case Order Out. Judge Nancy Torresen assigned to preside over this case. So Ordered by Chief District Judge Jon D. Levy. (ej) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#46

(#46) REPLY to Objection to Motion re #31 MOTION to Stay filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Surreply due by 6/10/2019. (Glahn, Wilbur) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#45

(#45) REFERRAL ORDER. All of the judges are recused, case referred to District of Maine. Concurring Order sent. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 6/20/2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (ej) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

36 #1

Exhibit 1 - Proposed Reply Memorandum

#36

ENDORSED ORDER granting #36 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion for Leave to File using the appropriate event in CM/ECF. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 6/4/2019.(kad) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

31 #2

Exhibit 1 - Removed and Transferred Cases

31 #1

Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Stay

#31

(#46) REPLY to Objection to Motion re #31 MOTION to Stay filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Surreply due by 6/10/2019. (Glahn, Wilbur) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam B. Pignatelli on behalf of Michael Dipre, Mark Weinreb (Pignatelli, Adam) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Joly, Rose) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

3 #2

Exhibit 2 - State Court Documents

3 #1

Exhibit 1- Case Summary

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Removal (Supplemental) by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Case Summary, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Documents)(Joly, Rose) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Delaney, Michael) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Summons, Complaint and Other Process

#1

NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmacetica, Inc., Allergan PLC, Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Rite-Aid of Maryland, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by April 8, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 4/8/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ej) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENDORSED ORDER granting #31 Motion to Stay. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by District Judge Nancy Torresen.(vln) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) PROCEDURAL NOTICE: Due to recusal of NH judges, case referred to the District of Maine. Original filings shall continue to be filed electronically with the Clerk in New Hampshire in accordance with the district Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants, however, are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. No courtesy filings need to be filed in the District of Maine. NOTICE Signed by Erica Jordan, Deputy Clerk. (ej) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to District Judge Nancy Torresen. The new case designation is: 1:19-cv-332-NT. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. (ej) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) CONCURRING ORDER re: #45 Designated Case Order Out. Judge Nancy Torresen assigned to preside over this case. So Ordered by Chief District Judge Jon D. Levy. (ej) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) REPLY to Objection to Motion re #31 MOTION to Stay filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Surreply due by 6/10/2019. (Glahn, Wilbur) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) REFERRAL ORDER. All of the judges are recused, case referred to District of Maine. Concurring Order sent. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 6/20/2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (ej) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER granting #36 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion for Leave to File using the appropriate event in CM/ECF. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 6/4/2019.(kad) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) SURREPLY to Reply to #26 MOTION to Remand filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - MDL 161_0 2018.03.01 Statement of Interest by USA)(Pandolph, William) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER granting #38 Partially Assented to MOTION to Exceed Page Limitations Under Local Rule 7.1(e)(1). Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam B. Pignatelli on behalf of Michael Dipre, Mark Weinreb (Pignatelli, Adam) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motions for pro hac vice admission of Mark Cheffo, Esq.; Charles C. Lifland, Esq.; Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr, Esq. have been received. Unless said motions with the required fee are filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 5/1/2019. (ej) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmacetica, Inc., Allergan PLC, Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Rite-Aid of Maryland, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by April 8, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 4/8/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ej) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motions for pro hac vice admission of Brien T. O'Connor, Esq.; Donna Welch, Esq. have been received. Unless said motions with the required fee are filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 5/1/2019. (ej) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ej) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-332-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Joly, Rose) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Removal (Supplemental) by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Case Summary, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Documents)(Joly, Rose) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Delaney, Michael) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Grafton County Superior Court, case number 215-2018-cv-00323 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1792717) filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 4/19/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 4/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons, Complaint and Other Process, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Delaney, Michael) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Walgreens Boots Alliance Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Insys Therapeutics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Health Solutions Inc. is a litigant