This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/28/2019 at 07:31:04 (UTC).

Graff v. Biltmore Loan and Jewelry - Scottsdale LLC

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 Graff filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Biltmore Loan and Jewelry - Scottsdale LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan M Brnovich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03757

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan M Brnovich

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stanley V Graff

Defendants

Leslie Hindman Auctioneers Incorporated

Biltmore Loan and Jewelry - Scottsdale LLC

Jim Parks

Ray Harvey

Owings Gallery Incorporated

Zaplin-Lambert Gallery Incorporated

Nathaniel O Owings

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Douglas F Monkhouse

Attorney at Bracewell LLP - Dallas, TX

1445 Ross Ave., Ste. 3800

Dallas, TX 75202

Kirstin Beth Ives

Attorney at Falkenberg Ives LLP

30 N Lasalle St., Ste. 4020

Chicago, IL 60602

Joseph Marion Cox

Attorney at Bracewell LLP - Dallas, TX

1445 Ross Ave., Ste. 3800

Dallas, TX 75202

Defendant Attorneys

Alan R Borlack

Attorney at Bailey Borlack & Nadelhoffer LLC

135 S Lasalle St., Ste. 3950

Chicago, IL 60603

Eric Gustav Grossman

Attorney at Bailey Borlack & Nadelhoffer LLC

135 S Lasalle St., Ste. 3950

Chicago, IL 60603

John Thomas Wagener

Attorney at Dressler & Peters LLC

70 W Hubbard St., Ste. 200

Chicago, IL 60654

Marc Alan Primack

Attorney at Dressler & Peters LLC

70 W Hubbard St., Ste. 200

Chicago, IL 60654

Kenneth D Peters

Attorney at Dressler & Peters LLC

70 W Hubbard St., Ste. 200

Chicago, IL 60654

John T Wagener

Attorney at Dressler & Peters LLC

70 W Hubbard St., Ste. 200

Chicago, IL 60654

Marc A Primack

Attorney at Dressler & Peters LLC

70 W Hubbard St., Ste. 200

Chicago, IL 60654

Barry F Irwin

Attorney at Irwin LLP

222 S Riverside Plz., Ste. 2350

Chicago, IL 60606

Adam J Reis

Attorney at Irwin LLP

222 S Riverside Plz., Ste. 2350

Chicago, IL 60606

Reid P Huefner

Attorney at Irwin LLP

222 S Riverside Plz., Ste. 2350

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#128

#127

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

#1

155 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#128) ORDER:Defendant Biltmore Loan and Jewelry-Scottsdale LLC shall have until August 12, 2019 to file its Motion to Dismiss or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 7/26/2019. (TCA) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • Remark: as to out of state counsel Douglas F Monkhouse and Kirstin Beth Ives - removed for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#127) *First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal by Biltmore Loan and Jewelry - Scottsdale LLC. (Peters, Kenneth) *Modified to correct motion type on 7/23/2019 (REK). (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • (#126) ORDER: Upon review of the parties R26(f)Case Management Report, a scheduling conference appears premature. Therefore, IT IS ORDERED vacating the telephonic conference scheduled for July 11, 2019 and resetting to August 16, 2019 at 09:00 AM (15 minutes) in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#125) AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Original Complaint against Stanley V Graff filed by Stanley V Graff.(Cox, Joseph) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#124) Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Joint Report filed by Plaintiff Stanley V Graff. (Cox, Joseph) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#123) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #122 Report - Status filed by Stanley V Graff. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1) - The name, address, email address, State Bar Attorney number, telephone number, and optionally the fax number, of the attorney appearing for the party in the action or proceeding and whether the attorney appears for the plaintiff, defendant, or other party - in propria persona - must be typewritten or printed in teh space to the left of the center of the page and beginning at line one (1) on the first page. The space to the right of the center must be reserved for the filing marks of the Clerk. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#122) STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Stanley V Graff. (Cox, Joseph) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Joseph M Cox on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#121) ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a new complaint no later than July 8, 2019 and file the status report as soon as counsel's pro hac vice application is approved. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 7/11/2019 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich.. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/25/2019. (TCA) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
112 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The Owings Gallery, Inc. (Irwin, Barry) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/29/2019.] (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Motion by Barry F. Irwin for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/28/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Irwin, Barry) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/29/2019.] (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION by Defendants Ray Harvey, Nathaniel O. Owings, The Owings Gallery, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Irwin, Barry) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/29/2019.] (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Initial status hearing set for 10/5/17 at 8:30 a.m. in courtroom 1241. Parties shall refer to Judge St. Eve's web page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov and file a Rule 26(f) Initial Status Report by 10/2/17 as set forth in the Rule 26(f) Report procedure. Mailed notice (kef, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/29/2019.] (Entered: 09/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes the MIDP Standing Order. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ags, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/29/2019.] (Entered: 09/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (ags, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/29/2019.] (Entered: 09/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. (cc, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/29/2019.] (Entered: 09/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ray Harvey by Barry F. Irwin (Irwin, Barry) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/29/2019.] (Entered: 09/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Irwin, Barry) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/29/2019.] (Entered: 09/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from Cook County, case number (2017-L-050808) filed by Ray Harvey Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-13592362. Ray Harvey Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Irwin, Barry) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/29/2019.] (Entered: 09/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph M Cox

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kirstin Beth Ives