This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2021 at 09:14:23 (UTC).

Grafe v. CSAA General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 Grafe filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CSAA General Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lewis T. Babcock and Kristen L. Mix. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00100

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Lewis T. Babcock

Kristen L. Mix

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stewart Grafe

Defendant

CSAA General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer Danielle Chamberlain

Attorney at Bowman & Chamberlain, LLC

2727 Bryant Street, Suite 102

Denver, CO 80211

Jerry Ray Bowman, II

Attorney at Bowman & Chamberlain, LLC

2727 Bryant Street, Suite 102

Denver, CO 80211

Jessica Marie Mauser

Attorney at Bowman & Chamberlain, LLC

2727 Bryant Street, Suite 102

Denver, CO 80211

Defendant Attorneys

Emma Kathleen Knight

Attorney at Campbell Wagner Frazier & Dvorchak, LLC

5251 Dtc Parkway, Suite 350

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

Rebecca Kirsten Wagner

Attorney at Campbell Wagner Frazier & Dvorchak, LLC

5251 Dtc Parkway, Suite 350

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

Devon D. A. Bell

Attorney at Campbell Wagner Frazier & Dvorchak, LLC

5251 Dtc Parkway, Suite 350

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Firm Name Change by Plaintiff Stewart Grafe (Bowman, Jerry) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#24

(#24) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/26/21. KLM Civil Motions Practice Standards. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Rebecca Kirsten Wagner (Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#19

(#19) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant CSAA General Insurance Company All parties consent.. (Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#18

(#18) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant CSAA General Insurance Company. (Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#17

(#17) MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Defendant by Defendant CSAA General Insurance Company. (Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jessica Marie Mauser on behalf of Stewart GrafeAttorney Jessica Marie Mauser added to party Stewart Grafe(pty:pla) (Mauser, Jessica) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

State Court Register of Actions

1 #9

Exhibit D-Colorado Secretary of State Report

1 #8

Exhibit C-Traffic Accident Report

1 #7

Exhibit B-Registered Voter Information

1 #6

Exhibit A-State Court Affidavit of Service

1 #5

Exhibit A-State Court Delay Reduction Order

1 #4

Exhibit A-State Court Amended Civil Procedure Order

1 #3

Exhibit A-State Court Civil Procedure Order

1 #2

Exhibit A-State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A-State Court Complaint

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Firm Name Change by Plaintiff Stewart Grafe (Bowman, Jerry) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/26/21. KLM Civil Motions Practice Standards. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #19 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/26/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Rebecca Kirsten Wagner (Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Devon D. A. Bell is relieved of any further representation of Defendant. The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate Attorney Bell as counsel of record, and to remove this name from the electronic certificate of mailing. Defendant shall continue to be represented by Attorneys Rebecca Wagner and Emma Knight. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/25/2021. Text Only Entry(klmlc2, ) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#20) MINUTE ORDER. In accordance with efforts to minimize the spread of COVID-19, all counsel or parties who wish to participate in, or members of the public who wish to listen into, the Scheduling Conference set for March 15, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. shall do so by TELEPHONE by calling the Court at 888-363-4749, Access Code: 2115325#, at the time of the hearing. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/25/2021. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, ) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant CSAA General Insurance Company All parties consent.. (Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant CSAA General Insurance Company. (Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Defendant by Defendant CSAA General Insurance Company. (Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jessica Marie Mauser on behalf of Stewart GrafeAttorney Jessica Marie Mauser added to party Stewart Grafe(pty:pla) (Mauser, Jessica) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, ) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-100-KLM (angar, ) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (alave, ) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Civil Complaint and Jury Demand upon CSAA General Insurance Company on 12/23/2020. (alave, ) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against CSAA General Insurance Company, filed by Stewart Grafe.(alave, ) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • Docket(#4) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, ) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Emma Kathleen Knight on behalf of CSAA General Insurance CompanyAttorney Emma Kathleen Knight added to party CSAA General Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Knight, Emma) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rebecca Kirsten Wagner on behalf of CSAA General Insurance CompanyAttorney Rebecca Kirsten Wagner added to party CSAA General Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CSAA General Insurance Company from Jefferson County District Court, Case Number 2020CV31280. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7669176), filed by CSAA General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-State Court Civil Procedure Order, #4 Exhibit A-State Court Amended Civil Procedure Order, #5 Exhibit A-State Court Delay Reduction Order, #6 Exhibit A-State Court Affidavit of Service, #7 Exhibit B-Registered Voter Information, #8 Exhibit C-Traffic Accident Report, #9 Exhibit D-Colorado Secretary of State Report, #10 State Court Register of Actions, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Bell, Devon) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CSAA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Devon D. A. Bell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emma Kathleen Knight

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca Kirsten Wagner