This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 10:41:10 (UTC).

GRAFAS et al v. BOROUGH OF BRIELLE et al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 GRAFAS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against BOROUGH OF BRIELLE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian R. Martinotti and Lois H. Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-09467

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian R. Martinotti

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

608 GREEN AVENUE ASSOCIATES LLC

HOFFMAN'S RESTAURANT LLC

LARRY GRAFAS

HOFFMAN'S RESTAURANT LLC doing business as Waypoint 622

Defendants

PLANNING BOARD OF BUROUGH OF BRIELLE

BUROUGH OF BRIELLE

JOHN DOES 1-10

BOROUGH OF BRIELLE

PLANNING BOARD OF BOROUGH OF BRIELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRIAN MATTHEW BLOCK

Attorney at MANDELBAUM SALSBURG PC

3 Becker Farm Road, Suite 105

Roseland, NJ 07068

ARTHUR GROSSMAN

Attorney at MANDELBAUM SALSBURG PC

3 Becker Farm Rd Suite 105

Roseland, NJ 07068

Defendant Attorneys

RYAN MICHAEL AMBERGER

Attorney at MONTENEGRO THOMPSON MONTENEGRO & GENZ PC

531 Burnt Tavern Road

Brick, NJ 08724

DAVID ALLAN CLARK

Attorney at GLUCK WALRATH, LLP

428 River View Plaza

Trenton, NJ 08611

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Order Initial Conference set for 9/3/2019 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/10/19. (if, ) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by PLANNING BOARD OF BOROUGH OF BRIELLE.(CLARK, DAVID) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BOROUGH OF BRIELLE.(AMBERGER, RYAN) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LARRY GRAFAS, 608 GREEN AVENUE ASSOCIATES LLC, HOFFMAN'S RESTAURANT LLC. PLANNING BOARD OF BOROUGH OF BRIELLE waiver sent on 5/3/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (BLOCK, BRIAN) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LARRY GRAFAS, 608 GREEN AVENUE ASSOCIATES LLC, HOFFMAN'S RESTAURANT LLC. BOROUGH OF BRIELLE waiver sent on 4/26/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (BLOCK, BRIAN) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOROUGH OF BRIELLE, PLANNING BOARD OF BOROUGH OF BRIELLE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by 608 GREEN AVENUE ASSOCIATES LLC, HOFFMAN'S RESTAURANT LLC. (BLOCK, BRIAN) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BOROUGH OF BRIELLE, PLANNING BOARD OF BOROUGH OF BRIELLE. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9569698) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LARRY GRAFAS, 608 GREEN AVENUE ASSOCIATES LLC, HOFFMAN'S RESTAURANT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BLOCK, BRIAN) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order Initial Conference set for 9/3/2019 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/10/19. (if, ) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by PLANNING BOARD OF BOROUGH OF BRIELLE.(CLARK, DAVID) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BOROUGH OF BRIELLE.(AMBERGER, RYAN) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LARRY GRAFAS, 608 GREEN AVENUE ASSOCIATES LLC, HOFFMAN'S RESTAURANT LLC. PLANNING BOARD OF BOROUGH OF BRIELLE waiver sent on 5/3/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (BLOCK, BRIAN) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LARRY GRAFAS, 608 GREEN AVENUE ASSOCIATES LLC, HOFFMAN'S RESTAURANT LLC. BOROUGH OF BRIELLE waiver sent on 4/26/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (BLOCK, BRIAN) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOROUGH OF BRIELLE, PLANNING BOARD OF BOROUGH OF BRIELLE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jmh) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by 608 GREEN AVENUE ASSOCIATES LLC, HOFFMAN'S RESTAURANT LLC. (BLOCK, BRIAN) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BOROUGH OF BRIELLE, PLANNING BOARD OF BOROUGH OF BRIELLE. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9569698) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LARRY GRAFAS, 608 GREEN AVENUE ASSOCIATES LLC, HOFFMAN'S RESTAURANT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BLOCK, BRIAN) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A. Clark