This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/05/2021 at 05:55:43 (UTC).

Grace v. J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. et al

Case Summary

On 06/12/2020 Grace filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against J P Morgan Chase Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul A. Engelmayer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04523

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Engelmayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Grace

Petitioner

Synova Asset Management, LLC

Defendants

J.P. Morgan Chase & Co.

John Does 1-25

J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp.

J.P. Morgan Securities LLC

Interested Party

Breakwater Trading LLC

Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider

Charles Herbert Proctor, III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam James Pessin

Attorney at Fine, Kaplan and Black, R.P.C.

1835 Market Street, 28Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Roberta D. Liebenberg

Attorney at Fine, Kaplan and Black, R.P.C.

1835 Market Street, 28Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Joseph Goldberg

Attorney at Freedman Boyd Hollander Goldberg Urias & Ward P.A.

20 First Plaza, Suite 700

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Vincent J Ward

Attorney at Freedman Boyd Hollander et al.

20 First Plaza, Suite 700

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Petitioner and Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider Attorney

Karen M. Lerner

Attorney at Kirby McInerney LLP

250 Park Avenue, Suite 820

New York, NY 10177

Defendant Attorneys

Amanda Flug Davidoff

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP (DC)

1700 New York Avenue, N.W., Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006

Robert Andrew Sacks

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP (Los Angeles)

1888 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Akash Mayank Toprani

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP (NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Interested Party Attorney

Linda P. Nussbaum

Attorney at Nussbaum Law Group, P.C.

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#38

#37

#36

#35

#34

#33

#32

31 #2

Text of Proposed Order

31 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Bart D. Cohen

31 #31

Main Document

#25

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MOTION for Christopher P.T. Tourek to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Budo Trading LLC, Thomas Gramatis, Kohl Trading LLC, M & N Trading, L.L.C., Port 22, LLC, Charles Herbert Proctor, III, Robert Charles Class A, L.P., Rock Capital Markets, LLC, Synova Asset Management, LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-03515-PAE et al..(Fata, Anthony) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) SCHEDULING ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: 1. The parties shall file a joint letter (i) updating the Court on the status of mediation and settlement efforts, and (ii) requesting an additional extension of case deadlines, if necessary, by February 1, 2021. 2. Plaintiffs shall file their consolidated complaint by February 19, 2021. 3. Defendants shall answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the consolidated complaint by April 16, 2021. 4. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss by June 15, 2021. 5. Defendants shall file their reply in support of their motion to dismiss by July 15, 2021. SO ORDERED. Amended Pleadings due by 2/19/2021. Motions due by 4/16/2021. Responses due by 6/15/2021 Replies due by 7/15/2021. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/02/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-03515-PAE et al. (ama) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. Document filed by John Grace. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-03515-PAE et al..(Ward, Vincent) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. Document filed by John Grace. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-03515-PAE et al..(Goldberg, Joseph) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by Endeavor Trading, LLC, Breakwater Trading LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-03515-PAE, 1:20-cv-04523-PAE, 1:20-cv-05285-PAE.(Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) OPINION & ORDER re: (27 in 1:20-cv-03515-PAE) MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Class Plaintiffs and for Consolidation of Related Cases. filed by Breakwater Trading LLC, (25 in 1:20-cv-04523-PAE) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg P.C. and Kirby McInerney LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidate Related Cases. filed by Synova Asset Management, LLC, Charles Herbert Proctor, III, (45 in 1:20-cv-05360-PAE) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg P.C. and Kirby McInerney LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidate Related Cases. filed by Synova Asset Management, LLC, Charles Herbert Proctor, III, (38 in 1:20-cv-05360-PAE) LETTER MOTION to Expedite Schedule for Motions to Consolidate and Appoint Interim Lead Counsel addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Karen Lerner dated July 15, 2020. filed by Charles Herbert Proctor, III, (37 in 1:20-cv-05298-PAE) LETTER MOTION to Expedite Schedule for Motions to Consolidate and Appoint Interim Lead Counsel addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Karen Lerner dated July 15, 2020. filed by Robert Charles Class A, L.P., (22 in 1:20-cv-05772-PAE) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg P.C. and Kirby McInerney LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidate Related Cases. filed by Synova Asset Management, LLC, Charles Herbert Proctor, III, (51 in 1:20-cv-05298-PAE) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg P.C. and Kirby McInerney as Interim Co-lead Counsel and Consolidate Related Cases. filed by Synova Asset Management, LLC, Charles Herbert Proctor, III, (23 in 1:20-cv-04523-PAE) MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Class Plaintiffs and for Consolidation of Related Cases. filed by Breakwater Trading LLC, (24 in 1:20-cv-05285-PAE) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg P.C. and Kirby McInerney as Interim Co-lead Counsel and Consolidate Related Cases. filed by Synova Asset Management, LLC, Charles Herbert Proctor, III, (29 in 1:20-cv-03515-PAE) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg P.C. and Kirby McInerney LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidate Related Cases. filed by Synova Asset Management, LLC, Charles Herbert Proctor, III, (7 in 1:20-cv-05285-PAE) LETTER MOTION to Expedite Schedule for Motions to Consolidate and Appoint Interim Lead Counsel addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Karen Lerner dated July 15, 2020. filed by Charles Herbert Proctor, III, (22 in 1:20-cv-05285-PAE) MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Class Plaintiffs and for Consolidation of Related Cases. filed by Breakwater Trading LLC., Motions terminated: (51 in 1:20-cv-05298-PAE) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg P.C. and Kirby McInerney as Interim Co-lead Counsel and Consolidate Related Cases. filed by Synova Asset Management, LLC, Charles Herbert Proctor, III, (37 in 1:20-cv-05298-PAE) LETTER MOTION to Expedite Schedule for Motions to Consolidate and Appoint Interim Lead Counsel addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Karen Lerner dated July 15, 2020. filed by Robert Charles Class A, L.P., (23 in 1:20-cv-04523-PAE) MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Class Plaintiffs and for Consolidation of Related Cases. filed by Breakwater Trading LLC, (25 in 1:20-cv-04523-PAE) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg P.C. and Kirby McInerney LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidate Related Cases. filed by Synova Asset Management, LLC, Charles Herbert Proctor, III, (38 in 1:20-cv-05360-PAE) LETTER MOTION to Expedite Schedule for Motions to Consolidate and Appoint Interim Lead Counsel addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Karen Lerner dated July 15, 2020. filed by Charles Herbert Proctor, III, (22 in 1:20-cv-05285-PAE) MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Class Plaintiffs and for Consolidation of Related Cases. filed by Breakwater Trading LLC, (7 in 1:20-cv-05285-PAE) LETTER MOTION to Expedite Schedule for Motions to Consolidate and Appoint Interim Lead Counsel addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Karen Lerner dated July 15, 2020. filed by Charles Herbert Proctor, III, (27 in 1:20-cv-03515-PAE) MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Class Plaintiffs and for Consolidation of Related Cases. filed by Breakwater Trading LLC, (45 in 1:20-cv-05360-PAE) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg P.C. and Kirby McInerney LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidate Related Cases. filed by Synova Asset Management, LLC, Charles Herbert Proctor, III, (29 in 1:20-cv-03515-PAE) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg P.C. and Kirby McInerney LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidate Related Cases. filed by Synova Asset Management, LLC, Charles Herbert Proctor, III, (22 in 1:20-cv-05772-PAE) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg P.C. and Kirby McInerney LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidate Related Cases. filed by Synova Asset Management, LLC, Charles Herbert Proctor, III, (24 in 1:20-cv-05285-PAE) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg P.C. and Kirby McInerney as Interim Co-lead Counsel and Consolidate Related Cases. filed by Synova Asset Management, LLC, Charles Herbert Proctor, III. It is hereby: ORDERED that the motions to consolidate the above-captions cases are granted. No. 20 Civ. 3515, Dkts. 27, 29. The above-captioned cases shall proceed under the name In re JPMorgan Treasury Futures Spoofing Litig. and under the case number 20 Civ. 3515. In light of the consolidation, the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the other above-captioned cases. ORDERED that the motion to appoint Lowey and Kirby as Interim Co-Lead Counsel for the putative class, No. 20 Civ. 3515, Dkt. 29, is granted. Lowey and Kirby shall be responsible for the overall conduct of the litigation on behalf of the putative class of investor plaintiffs, including providing supervision of all class plaintiffs' counsel in this litigation. As interim co-lead counsel, Lowey and Kirby have the authority to as further set forth in this Opinion. It is further ORDERED that Interim Co-Lead Counsel may not delegate its responsibilities or assign legal work to other law firms without the prior approval of the Court, except that the Court hereby pre-approves such delegation of responsibilities to NLG, Cafferty, Scott+Scott, and Freed Kanner. Court approval of assignments to these four firms is not required. The decision of when to draw on the resources and expertise of other law firms is left to the sole discretion of the Interim Co-Lead Counsel. No firm to which Interim Co-Lead Counsel delegates responsibility may further sub-delegate the work without the prior approval of Interim Co-Lead Counsel and the Court. It is further ORDERED that the motions by NLG/Kessler for appointment as interim lead counsel are denied: No. 20 Civ. 3515, Dkt. 27; No. 20 Civ. 5285, Dkt. 22; and No. 20 Civ. 4523, Dkt. 23. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the following pending motions as moot: No. 20 Civ. 5298, Dkt. 37; No. 20 Civ. 5285, Dkt. 7; and No. 20 Civ. 5360, Dkt. 38. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/9/20) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-03515-PAE et al. (yv) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:20-cv-03515-PAE. (yv) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #25 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg P.C. and Kirby McInerney LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidate Related Cases. . Document filed by Charles Herbert Proctor, III, Synova Asset Management, LLC..(Lerner, Karen) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #25 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg P.C. and Kirby McInerney LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidate Related Cases. . Document filed by Breakwater Trading LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Bart D. Cohen, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 8/13/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Flug Davidoff on behalf of J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC..(Davidoff, Amanda) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER ADJOURNING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED as follows: J.P. Morgan's time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is hereby adjourned sine die, unless a date is set for J.P. Morgan to respond to the Breakwater, Proctor and/or Robert Charles complaints, or a complaint in any other action arising from the same transactions and events as this action, in which case its deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in this action shall be the earliest due date(s) in such other action(s). Except as to the defense of insufficiency of service of process in this action, no defense of J.P. Morgan, including, without limitation, defenses based upon lack of personal jurisdiction, is prejudiced or waived by J.P. Morgan's executing, agreeing to, or filing this Stipulation. This Stipulation may be executed in separate counterparts, and counterparts maybe executed in facsimile form, each of which shall be an original. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/24/2020) (rro) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by John Grace..(Pessin, Adam) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC..(pc) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John Grace..(Pessin, Adam) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pessin, Adam) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against John Does 1-25, J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20237261)Document filed by John Grace..(Pessin, Adam) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Breakwater Trading LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Synova Asset Management, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant