This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/22/2021 at 10:05:06 (UTC).

Grace v. Boehringer Ingelheim et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 Grace filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Boehringer Ingelheim. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robin L. Rosenberg and Bruce E. Reinhart. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-81481

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

Referral Judge

Bruce E. Reinhart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREGORY GRACE

Defendants

Boehringer Ingelheim

GlaxoSmithKline

Pfizer

Sanofi

Acic Pharmaceuticals

Ajanta

Amneal

ANDA Repository

Ani Pharmaceuticals

Apotex

Appco Pharma LLC

AUTOBINDO

Dr. Reddy's

Geri-Care

Glenmark

Granules

Heritage

Hikma

Hi-Tech

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jodi Chase Page

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Docket(DUPLICATE) Cases associated 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (mc) Modified text on 8/26/2021 (mc). (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • Docket(#3) MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81481-RLR. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-2924-RLR (pes) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCases associated Re: 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (pes) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (pes) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14951908, filed by Gregory Grace. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Page, Jodi) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less