This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/04/2022 at 06:19:54 (UTC).

Grace Del Rosario Aquino et al v. Fresenius USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2019 Grace Del Rosario Aquino filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Fresenius USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas P. Woodlock. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-10636

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas P. Woodlock

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Andres Aquino, Jr.

Graceila Flor Aquino-Vega

Grace Del Rosario Aquino

Andrea Grace Aquino

Defendants

FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC.

Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc.

Does 1-15 inclusive

Fresenius U.S.A., Inc.

Fresenius Medical Care North America Inc.

Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey C Bogert

Attorney at Jeffrey C Bogert Law Offices

501 Colorado Avenue Suite 204

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Jaime G Monteclaro

23505 Crenshaw Boulevard Suite 135

Torrance, CA 90505

Jaime G. Monteclaro

Attorney at Jaime G Monteclaro Law Offices

23505 Crenshaw Boulevard Suite 135

Torrance, CA 90505

Defendant Attorneys

Alex Edwin Spjute

Attorney at Dechert LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 4900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Maria R. Durant

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

100 High Street, 20Th Flr.

Boston, MA 02110

David H. Stern

Attorney at Dechert LLP

633 W. 5Th Street, Suite 4900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2032

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Fact Sheet against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:19-cv-10636, filed by Grace Del Rosario Aquino.(Monteclaro, Jaime) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#16

15 #1

Case Management Orders 1-16

#15

12 #1

*Restricted*

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution

#9

#8

4 #2

Exhibit Exh D-State Court Notice to Clerk of Removal to USDC

4 #1

Exhibit Exh C-Filed Process Pleadings & Order

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit B-Filed Complaint LASC BC651324

1 #1

Exhibit A-Filed Summons on Defendants

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Fact Sheet against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:19-cv-10636, filed by Grace Del Rosario Aquino.(Monteclaro, Jaime) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Maria R. Durant on behalf of FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., Fresenius U.S.A., Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc. (Durant, Maria) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: MDL PROCEDURAL AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS NO. 1-16 entered. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Orders 1-16)(Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: Pursuant to CTO MDL No. 2428 has been transferred from Central District of California and assigned civil action number: 19-10636. Central District of California case number: 18-9987. In Re: Fresenius/Granuflo Naturalyte Dialysate Products Liability Litigation, MDL 2428 (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Docket(#13) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-09987. (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Transfer Order from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2428, transferring case to USDC, District of Massachusetts and assigned to Honorable Douglas P. Woodluck. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION'S CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER #9 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Parties Joint Stipulation for an Order Staying Proceedings is granted. (iv) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Resolution of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Conditional Transfer Order filed by Defendants Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Conditional Transfer Order)(Spjute, Alex) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. answer now due 1/5/2019; Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc. answer now due 1/5/2019; Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc. answer now due 1/5/2019; Fresenius USA, Inc. answer now due 1/5/2019; Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc. answer now due 1/5/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.; Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc.; Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc.; Fresenius USA, Inc.; Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc..(Spjute, Alex) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , Notice of Lodging, #4 Exhibits C & D to Notice of Removal served on 11/30/2018. (Stern, David) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (et) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketNOTICE SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (Without Court Order)filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Grace Aquino, Andres Aquino, Jr, Grace Del Rosario Aquino, Graceila Flor Aquino-Vega. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/27/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF LODGING] (et) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc., Does 1-15 inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Grace Aquino, Andres Aquino, Jr, Graceila Flor Aquino-Vega, Grace Del Rosario Aquino. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/22/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 #1 . (et) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF LODGING filed Attaching Notice of Removal Exhibits C & D re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh C-Filed Process Pleadings & Order, #2 Exhibit Exh D-State Court Notice to Clerk of Removal to USDC)(Stern, David) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc., (Stern, David) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc.. (Stern, David) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC651324 Receipt No: 0973-22816720 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Filed Summons on Defendants, #2 Exhibit B-Filed Complaint LASC BC651324) (Attorney David H Stern added to party Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America(pty:dft), Attorney David H Stern added to party Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David H Stern added to party Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David H Stern added to party Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David H Stern added to party Fresenius USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Stern, David) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRESENIUS USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FRESENIUS USA MANUFACTURING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FRESENIUS USA MARKETING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FRESINIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDING INC. is a litigant