Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/01/2019 at 07:16:28 (UTC).

Grace Collins et al v. Richard Rionda Del Castro et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2019 Grace Collins filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Richard Rionda Del Castro. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles F. Eick, Christina A. Snyder and Cormac J. Carney. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-06738

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

Presiding Judges

Christina A. Snyder

Cormac J. Carney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Grace Collins

Fort Washington, MD 20744

Duk Sun Lyu

Fort Washington, MD 20744

Defendants

Saban Films LLC

Patricia Eberle Rionda Del Castro

Richard Rionda Del Castro

Speed Kills Production, Inc.

Hannibal Production, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Neer Lerner

Attorney at Hamrick and Evans LLP

2600 West Olive Avenue Suite 1020

Burbank, CA 91505

William Zak Shirley

Attorney at The Law Office of W Zak Shirley LLC

1340 Smith Avenue Suite 200

Baltimore, MD 21209

Alpheus Raymond Hamrick, III

Attorney at Hamrick and Evans LLP

2600 West Olive Avenue Suite 1020

Burbank, CA 91505

 

Court Documents

#47

RESTRICTED

#46

(#46) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION ON NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court, having been advised by the Plaintiff that this action has been resolved by a Notice of Dismissal #44 , hereby orders this action dismissed without prejudice. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case vacated and taken off calendar. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#44

(#44) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Grace Collins, Duk Sun Lyu. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Kernan, Stephen) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

43 #3

Proposed Order

43 #2

Declaration of Neer Lerner

43 #1

Memorandum of Law in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration

#43

(#43) PETITION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants Richard Rionda Del Castro, Hannibal Production, Inc., Speed Kills Production, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration, #2 Declaration of Neer Lerner, #3 Proposed Order) (Lerner, Neer) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

42 #1

Declaration of Neer Lerner

#42

(#42) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Saban Films LLC, Patricia Eberle Rionda Del Castro filed by Defendants Saban Films LLC, Patricia Eberle Rionda Del Castro. Motion set for hearing on 9/16/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neer Lerner, #2 Proposed Order) (Lerner, Neer) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

1 #15

Exhibit 1A (Part 2) - Complaint

1 #14

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #13

Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal filed in State Court

1 #12

Exhibit 1L - Court Orders

1 #7

Exhibit 1G - Praecipe

1 #3

Exhibit 1C - Aff. of Service

1 #2

Exhibit 1B - Summons

1 #1

Exhibit 1A (Part 1) - Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, Maryland, case number CAL 18-37261. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7667791), filed by Richard Rionda Del Castro, Hannibal Productions, Inc., Speed Kills Production, Inc., Patricia Eberle Rionda Del Castro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A (Part 1) - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1B - Summons, #3 Exhibit 1C - Aff. of Service, #4 Exhibit 1D - Motion to Amend File and Reconsider Emergency Injunctive Relief, #5 Exhibit 1E - Complaint and Jury Demand, #6 Exhibit 1F - Praecipe, #7 Exhibit 1G - Praecipe, #8 Exhibit 1H - Second Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, #9 Exhibit 1I - Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, #10 Exhibit 1J - Amended Motion to Amend File and Reconsider Emergency Injunctive Relief, #11 Exhibit 1K - Praecipe, #12 Exhibit 1L - Court Orders, #13 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal filed in State Court, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Exhibit 1A (Part 2) - Complaint)(Shirley, William) [Transferred from Maryland on 8/2/2019.] (Entered: 11/13/2018)

104 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) SEALED NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Cormac J. Carney, ORDERING Various Documents submitted by Plaintiff Grace Collins received on 08/12/2019 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Documents unintelligible. (iv) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION ON NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court, having been advised by the Plaintiff that this action has been resolved by a Notice of Dismissal #44 , hereby orders this action dismissed without prejudice. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case vacated and taken off calendar. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Grace Collins, Duk Sun Lyu. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Kernan, Stephen) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) PETITION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants Richard Rionda Del Castro, Hannibal Production, Inc., Speed Kills Production, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration, #2 Declaration of Neer Lerner, #3 Proposed Order) (Lerner, Neer) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Saban Films LLC, Patricia Eberle Rionda Del Castro filed by Defendants Saban Films LLC, Patricia Eberle Rionda Del Castro. Motion set for hearing on 9/16/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neer Lerner, #2 Proposed Order) (Lerner, Neer) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-06738 CJC(Ex). (rn) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Grace Collins. (iv) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney William Zak Shirley on behalf of Defendants Patricia Eberle Rionda Del Castro, Richard Rionda Del Castro, Hannibal Production, Inc., Saban Films LLC, Speed Kills Production, Inc., Plaintiff Duk Sun Lyu. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney William Zak Shirley. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 8:18-cv-03503 GJH, from District of Maryland (Greenbelt). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:19-cv-06738 CAS (Ex). (esa) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative, transfer to U.S. District Court for the Central District of California by Patricia Eberle Rionda Del Castro, Richard Rionda Del Castro, Hannibal Productions, Inc., Saban Films, Inc., Speed Kills Production, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of William V. Bromiley Jr., #3 Affidavit of Richard Rionda Del Castro)(Shirley, William) [Transferred from Maryland on 8/2/2019.] (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Neer Lerner. Directing attorney Neer Lerner to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/19/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 8/2/2019.] (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Alpheus Raymond Hamrick, III. Directing attorney Alpheus Raymond Hamrick, III to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/19/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 8/2/2019.] (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Neer Lerner (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7677844.) by Patricia Eberle Rionda Del Castro, Richard Rionda Del Castro, Hannibal Productions, Inc., Speed Kills Production, Inc.(Shirley, William) [Transferred from Maryland on 8/2/2019.] (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alpheus Raymond Hamrick III (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7677843.) by Patricia Eberle Rionda Del Castro, Richard Rionda Del Castro, Hannibal Productions, Inc., Speed Kills Production, Inc.(Shirley, William) [Transferred from Maryland on 8/2/2019.] (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 11/14/2018. (c/m 11/14/18 jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 8/2/2019.] (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Correspondence from Clerk to plaintiffs re: removal notification (c/m 11/14/18 jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 8/2/2019.] (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (cags, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 8/2/2019.] (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Hannibal Productions, Inc., Speed Kills Production, Inc. (Shirley, William) [Transferred from Maryland on 8/2/2019.] (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, Maryland, case number CAL 18-37261. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7667791), filed by Richard Rionda Del Castro, Hannibal Productions, Inc., Speed Kills Production, Inc., Patricia Eberle Rionda Del Castro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A (Part 1) - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1B - Summons, #3 Exhibit 1C - Aff. of Service, #4 Exhibit 1D - Motion to Amend File and Reconsider Emergency Injunctive Relief, #5 Exhibit 1E - Complaint and Jury Demand, #6 Exhibit 1F - Praecipe, #7 Exhibit 1G - Praecipe, #8 Exhibit 1H - Second Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, #9 Exhibit 1I - Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, #10 Exhibit 1J - Amended Motion to Amend File and Reconsider Emergency Injunctive Relief, #11 Exhibit 1K - Praecipe, #12 Exhibit 1L - Court Orders, #13 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal filed in State Court, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Exhibit 1A (Part 2) - Complaint)(Shirley, William) [Transferred from Maryland on 8/2/2019.] (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Speed Kills Production, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alpheus Raymond Hamrick, III