This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2020 at 07:58:09 (UTC).

Grabovksy v. EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Grabovksy filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judges overseeing this case are Donald L. Cabell and Denise J. Casper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-11740

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Donald L. Cabell

Denise J. Casper

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Erica Sharar

Melissa Douglas

David Lucas

Melissa Cook

Daniella Holmes

Natalia Grabovksy

JOhn Rochfort

Eric Hazelwood

Rheannon Androckitis

Patricia Bonda

Wendy Stotsenburg

Sara Adamski

Erin Geist

Tracey Madden

Defendants

EF Education First International, AG

EF Education First International, Ltd.

EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Nathaniel McGrane

Attorney at McGrane PC

Four Embarcadero Center, 14Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Sean T. Carnathan

Attorney at O'Connor, Carnathan and Mack LLC

1 Van De Graaff Drive, Suite 104

Burlington, MA 01803

John J. Roddy

Attorney at Bailey & Glasser LLP

176 Federal Street, 5Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110

Barry M. Altman

Attorney at Altman & Altman

404 Main Street, Suite 3

Wilmington, MA 01887

Defendant Attorneys

Phillip Allen Syers

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

111 Huntington Avenue, Suite 520

Boston, MA 02199

Richard A. Schirtzer

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

865 South Figueroa Street, 10Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2543

Harvey J. Wolkoff

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

111 Huntington Avenue, Suite 520

Boston, MA 02199

 

Court Documents

#51

#49

#48

#47

#45

#44

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) NOTICE of Appearance by Barry M. Altman on behalf of Sara Adamski, Rheannon Androckitis, Patricia Bonda, Melissa Cook, Melissa Douglas, Erin Geist, Natalia Grabovksy, Eric Hazelwood, Daniella Holmes, David Lucas, Tracey Madden, John Rochfort, Erica Sharar, Wendy Stotsenburg (Altman, Barry) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard A. Schirtzer terminated (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Assented to MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant by EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc..(Syers, Phillip) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) NOTICE of Appearance by Harvey J. Wolkoff on behalf of EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc. (Wolkoff, Harvey) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean T. Carnathan on behalf of Sara Adamski, Rheannon Androckitis, Patricia Bonda, Melissa Cook, Melissa Douglas, Erin Geist, Natalia Grabovksy, Eric Hazelwood, Daniella Holmes, David Lucas, Tracey Madden, John Rochfort, Erica Sharar, Wendy Stotsenburg (Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • Docket(#46) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Roddy, John) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Roddy on behalf of Sara Adamski, Rheannon Androckitis, Patricia Bonda, Melissa Cook, Melissa Douglas, Erin Geist, Natalia Grabovksy, Eric Hazelwood, Daniella Holmes, David Lucas, Tracey Madden, John Rochfort, Erica Sharar, Wendy Stotsenburg (Roddy, John) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docket(#43) ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss // Defendants ' Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Failure to State a Claim by EF Education First International, AG, EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Schirtzer, Richard) (dlg). (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss // Defendant EF Education First International, AG Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Person Jurisdiction by EF Education First International, AG. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Schirtzer, Richard) (dlg). (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Syers, Phillip) (rmc). (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-13842732.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Syers, Phillip) QC mail re missing signature sent on 5/7/2020, instructed to re-file without re-paying (rmc). (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion Extending Time for Defendant to Answer Complaint. Both named Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to May 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/15/20. (dlg) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by EF Education First International, AG, EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc.. (Schirtzer, Richard)Attorney Richard A. Schirtzer added to party EF Education First International, AG(pty:dft) QC email for proposed order (dlg). (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting Joint #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Defendant EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc.s deadline to respond the Complaint is extended to April 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/30/20. (dlg) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc.. (Schirtzer, Richard)Attorney Richard A. Schirtzer added to party EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc. (pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmr) (jms). (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against EF Education First International, AG, EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13637954.), filed by Natalia Grabovksy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)The new case number is 3:20-cv-508-GPC-BLM. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (McGrane, William)(jmr) (jms). (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EF Institute for Cultural Exchange Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean T. Carnathan