This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/16/2020 at 11:40:52 (UTC).

Grabovksy v. EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2020 Grabovksy filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gonzalo P. Curiel and Barbara Lynn Major. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00508

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gonzalo P. Curiel

Referral Judge

Barbara Lynn Major

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Natalia Grabovksy

Defendants

EF Education First International, AG

EF Education First International Ltd.

EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Nathaniel McGrane

Attorney at McGrane PC

Four Embarcadero Center, 14Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorney

Richard A. Schirtzer

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

865 South Figueroa Street, 10Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2543

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Natalia Grabovksy. (McGrane, William) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #9 MOTION to Dismiss // Defendant EF Education First International, AG Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Person Jurisdiction, #10 MOTION to Dismiss // Defendants ' Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Failure to State a Claim : Any response to either motion shall be filed on or before June 12, 2020. Any reply shall be filed on or before June 26, 2020. A hearing on this matter is re-scheduled for July 10, 2020 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/12/20.(dlg) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

10 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss // Defendants ' Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Failure to State a Claim by EF Education First International, AG, EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Schirtzer, Richard) (dlg). (Entered: 05/08/2020)

9 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss // Defendant EF Education First International, AG Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Person Jurisdiction by EF Education First International, AG. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Schirtzer, Richard) (dlg). (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#8

(#8) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Syers, Phillip) (rmc). (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#7

(#7) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-13842732.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Syers, Phillip) QC mail re missing signature sent on 5/7/2020, instructed to re-file without re-paying (rmc). (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion Extending Time for Defendant to Answer Complaint. Both named Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to May 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/15/20. (dlg) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

#5

(#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by EF Education First International, AG, EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc.. (Schirtzer, Richard)Attorney Richard A. Schirtzer added to party EF Education First International, AG(pty:dft) QC email for proposed order (dlg). (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting Joint #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Defendant EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc.s deadline to respond the Complaint is extended to April 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/30/20. (dlg) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#3

(#3) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc.. (Schirtzer, Richard)Attorney Richard A. Schirtzer added to party EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc. (pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 03/27/2020)

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against EF Education First International, AG, EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13637954.), filed by Natalia Grabovksy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)The new case number is 3:20-cv-508-GPC-BLM. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (McGrane, William)(jmr) (jms). (Entered: 03/18/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Natalia Grabovksy. (McGrane, William) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #9 MOTION to Dismiss // Defendant EF Education First International, AG Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Person Jurisdiction, #10 MOTION to Dismiss // Defendants ' Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Failure to State a Claim : Any response to either motion shall be filed on or before June 12, 2020. Any reply shall be filed on or before June 26, 2020. A hearing on this matter is re-scheduled for July 10, 2020 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/12/20.(dlg) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss // Defendants ' Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Failure to State a Claim by EF Education First International, AG, EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Schirtzer, Richard) (dlg). (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss // Defendant EF Education First International, AG Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Person Jurisdiction by EF Education First International, AG. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Schirtzer, Richard) (dlg). (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Syers, Phillip) (rmc). (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-13842732.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Syers, Phillip) QC mail re missing signature sent on 5/7/2020, instructed to re-file without re-paying (rmc). (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion Extending Time for Defendant to Answer Complaint. Both named Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to May 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/15/20. (dlg) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by EF Education First International, AG, EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc.. (Schirtzer, Richard)Attorney Richard A. Schirtzer added to party EF Education First International, AG(pty:dft) QC email for proposed order (dlg). (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting Joint #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Defendant EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc.s deadline to respond the Complaint is extended to April 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/30/20. (dlg) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc.. (Schirtzer, Richard)Attorney Richard A. Schirtzer added to party EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc. (pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmr) (jms). (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against EF Education First International, AG, EF Institute for Cultural Exchange, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13637954.), filed by Natalia Grabovksy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)The new case number is 3:20-cv-508-GPC-BLM. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (McGrane, William)(jmr) (jms). (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EF Institute for Cultural Exchange Inc is a litigant