This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:40:32 (UTC).

Grabarczyk v. Stein et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Grabarczyk filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Stein. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James C. Dever, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00048

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Dever, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenneth Grabarczyk

Defendants

Bob Schurmeier

Mr. Joshua Stein

Sean Boone

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul M. Dubbeling

Attorney at P.M. Dubbeling, PLLC

210 North Columbia Street

Chapel Hill, NC 27514

Defendant Attorneys

Jason Paul Caccamo

Attorney at NC Department of Justice

114 W. Edenton St.

Raleigh, NC 27603

Tammera Sudderth Hill

Attorney at North Carolina Deptartment of Justice

114 West Edenton Street, 9001 Mail Service Center, Post Office Box 629

Raleigh, NC 27602-0629

Anna M Davis

Attorney at NC Department of Justice

Post Office Box 629

Raleigh, NC 27602-0629

Kathryn H. Shields

Attorney at NC Department of Justice

Post Office Box 629

Raleigh, NC 27602-0629

 

Court Documents

#3

Notice to Counsel regarding: #2 Notice of Appearance, #3 Financial Disclosure Statement - Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the notice of appearance and the financial disclosure statement prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No action required at this time. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#7

No Description Available

#17

(#17) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Sean Boone. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Shields, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Notice filed by Kenneth Grabarczyk regarding #1 Complaint Proposed Summonses. (Dubbeling, Paul) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#8

No Description Available

#13

(#13) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Sean Boone. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Shields, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kathryn H. Shields terminated. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 4/17/2019. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#20

(#20) Memorandum in Support regarding #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bob Schurmeier, Joshua Stein. (Hill, Tammera) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#1

(#5) Notice filed by Kenneth Grabarczyk regarding #1 Complaint Proposed Summonses. (Dubbeling, Paul) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#15

(#15) Notice of Appearance filed by Anna M Davis on behalf of Sean Boone. (Davis, Anna) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

#6

(#6) Summonses Issued as to Sean Boone, Bob Schurmeier, Joshua Stein. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#16

(#16) Notice of Appearance filed by Jason Paul Caccamo on behalf of Bob Schurmeier, Joshua Stein. (Caccamo, Jason) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#10

No Description Available

#2

Notice to Counsel regarding: #2 Notice of Appearance, #3 Financial Disclosure Statement - Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the notice of appearance and the financial disclosure statement prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No action required at this time. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Memorandum in Support regarding #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bob Schurmeier, Joshua Stein. (Hill, Tammera) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bob Schurmeier, Joshua Stein. (Hill, Tammera) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kathryn H. Shields terminated. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 4/17/2019. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Sean Boone. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Shields, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Notice of Appearance filed by Jason Paul Caccamo on behalf of Bob Schurmeier, Joshua Stein. (Caccamo, Jason) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Notice of Appearance filed by Anna M Davis on behalf of Sean Boone. (Davis, Anna) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Sean Boone answer due 4/25/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/25/2019. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Sean Boone. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Shields, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2019
  • Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summonses Issued as to Sean Boone, Bob Schurmeier, Joshua Stein. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice filed by Kenneth Grabarczyk regarding #1 Complaint Proposed Summonses. (Dubbeling, Paul) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice filed by Kenneth Grabarczyk JS 44 Civil Sheet. (Dubbeling, Paul) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Counsel regarding: #2 Notice of Appearance, #3 Financial Disclosure Statement - Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the notice of appearance and the financial disclosure statement prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No action required at this time. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice - Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Kenneth Grabarczyk (Dubbeling, Paul) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Paul M. Dubbeling on behalf of Kenneth Grabarczyk. (Dubbeling, Paul) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Sean Boone, Bob Schurmeier, Joshua Stein ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4838512.), filed by Kenneth Grabarczyk. (Dubbeling, Paul) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.