This case was last updated from PACER on 01/21/2020 at 09:34:45 (UTC).

Gowin v. Ravin Crossbows, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 Gowin filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Ravin Crossbows, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Norman K. Moon and Robert S. Ballou. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00083

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Norman K. Moon

Referral Judge

Robert S. Ballou

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dennis Gowin

Defendants

Velocity Outdoor, Inc.

Ravin Crossbows, LLC

Venatics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Randall Troy Trost

Attorney at Randall J. Trost, P.C.

801 Main Street, Suite 1001

Lynchburg, VA 24504-1520

Joseph J. Triscaro

Attorney at Triscaro & Associates, Ltd.

6325 Cochran Road, Suite 8

Solon, OH 44139

Defendant Attorneys

Steven Douglas Brock

Attorney at Clark Hill, PLC

151 S. Old Woodward Avenue, Suite 200

Birmingham, MI 48009

Barry Brys Sutton

Attorney at Clark Hill, PLC

151 S. Old Woodward Avenue, Suite 200

Birmingham, MI 48009

Nathan Henry Schnetzler

Attorney at Frith Anderson & Peake PC

29 Franklin Road, Sw

Roanoke, VA 24011

Sean C. Workowski

Attorney at Frith Anderson & Peake PC

29 Franklin Road, Sw

Roanoke, VA 24011

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #12 Pretrial Order, Case Referred to Magistrate Judge by Dennis Gowin. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (Triscaro, Joseph)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendants Venatics, Inc. and Velocity Outdoor, Inc. by Ravin Crossbows, LLC (Brock, Steven)

#12

(#12) PRETRIAL ORDER (CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou as set forth herein). Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on January 2, 2020. (ca)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Barry Brys Sutton added for Defendants Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Venatics, Inc., and Velocity Outdoor, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on January 2, 2020. (ca)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Steven D. Brock added for Defendants Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Venatics, Inc., and Velocity Outdoor, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on January 2, 2020. (ca)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Velocity Outdoor, Inc., Venatics, Inc..(Workowski, Sean)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION for Barry B. Sutton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3299177. by Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Velocity Outdoor, Inc., Venatics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Workowski, Sean)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) MOTION for Steven D. Brock to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3299169. by Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Velocity Outdoor, Inc., Venatics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Workowski, Sean)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean C. Workowski on behalf of Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Velocity Outdoor, Inc., Venatics, Inc. (Workowski, Sean)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Henry Schnetzler on behalf of Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Velocity Outdoor, Inc., Venatics, Inc. (Schnetzler, Nathan)

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#3

(#3) MOTION for Joseph J. Triscaro to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3276805. by Dennis Gowin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Trost, Randall)

2 #2

Summons Issued Velocity Outdoor, Inc.

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Velocity Outdoor, Inc., Venatics, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued to Venatics, Inc., #2 Summons Issued to Velocity Outdoor, Inc.)(al)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT For Monetary Damages against Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Venatics, Inc. and Velocity Outdoor, Inc., filed by Dennis Gowin. (Filing & Administrative fee $400.00, Receipt #0423-3276438).(al) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (al).

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #12 Pretrial Order, Case Referred to Magistrate Judge by Dennis Gowin. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (Triscaro, Joseph)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendants Venatics, Inc. and Velocity Outdoor, Inc. by Ravin Crossbows, LLC (Brock, Steven)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PRETRIAL ORDER (CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou as set forth herein). Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on January 2, 2020. (ca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Barry Brys Sutton added for Defendants Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Venatics, Inc., and Velocity Outdoor, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on January 2, 2020. (ca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Steven D. Brock added for Defendants Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Venatics, Inc., and Velocity Outdoor, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on January 2, 2020. (ca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Velocity Outdoor, Inc., Venatics, Inc..(Workowski, Sean)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Barry B. Sutton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3299177. by Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Velocity Outdoor, Inc., Venatics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Workowski, Sean)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Steven D. Brock to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3299169. by Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Velocity Outdoor, Inc., Venatics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Workowski, Sean)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean C. Workowski on behalf of Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Velocity Outdoor, Inc., Venatics, Inc. (Workowski, Sean)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Henry Schnetzler on behalf of Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Velocity Outdoor, Inc., Venatics, Inc. (Schnetzler, Nathan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORAL ORDER granting #3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Joseph J. Triscaro for Dennis Gowin added. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 12/17/2019. (al)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Joseph J. Triscaro to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3276805. by Dennis Gowin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Trost, Randall)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Velocity Outdoor, Inc., Venatics, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued to Venatics, Inc., #2 Summons Issued to Velocity Outdoor, Inc.)(al)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT For Monetary Damages against Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Venatics, Inc. and Velocity Outdoor, Inc., filed by Dennis Gowin. (Filing & Administrative fee $400.00, Receipt #0423-3276438).(al) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (al).

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.