This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 11:09:35 (UTC).

GOWANS v. MERCHANTS ADJUSTMENT SERVICE INC et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 GOWANS filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against MERCHANTS ADJUSTMENT SERVICE INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are CHARLES A STAMPELOS, WILLIAM STAFFORD and ROBERT L HINKLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00144

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

CHARLES A STAMPELOS

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM STAFFORD

ROBERT L HINKLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melissa Gowans

Defendants

JOHN DOES 1-25

Merchants Adjustment Service, Inc.

MERCHANTS ADJUSTMENT SERVICE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JUSTIN ZEIG

Attorney at ZEIG LAW FIRM LLC - HOLLYWOOD FL

3475 Sheridan Street, Suite 310

Hollywood, FL 33021

Defendant Attorneys

RACHEL MALKOWSKI ORTIZ

Attorney at SHEPARD SMITH KOHLMYER & HAND PA - MAITLAND FL

2300 Maitland Center Parkway, Suite 100

Maitland, FL 32751

ERNEST HENRY KOHLMYER, III

Attorney at SHEPARD SMITH KOHLMYER & HAND PA - MAITLAND FL

2300 Maitland Center Parkway, Suite 100

Maitland, FL 32751

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL MALKOWSKI ORTIZ on behalf of MERCHANTS ADJUSTMENT SERVICE INC (ORTIZ, RACHEL) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE for all further proceedings. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 6/18/19. (blb) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#11

(#11) AMENDED DOCUMENT by MELISSA GOWANS. Amendment to #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (ZEIG, JUSTIN) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#10

(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (ZEIG, JUSTIN) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#9

(#9) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 5/17/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/17 /2019. Discovery due by 8/30/2019. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 5/3/19. (blb) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MELISSA GOWANS. MERCHANTS ADJUSTMENT SERVICE INC served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019. (ZEIG, JUSTIN) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by MERCHANTS ADJUSTMENT SERVICE INC. (KOHLMYER, ERNEST) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by MERCHANTS ADJUSTMENT SERVICE INC. (KOHLMYER, ERNEST) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Merchants Adjustment Service, Inc. (blb) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (blb) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

summons

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHN DOES 1-25, Merchants Adjustment Service, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4441011.), filed by Melissa Gowans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ZEIG, JUSTIN) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL MALKOWSKI ORTIZ on behalf of MERCHANTS ADJUSTMENT SERVICE INC (ORTIZ, RACHEL) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re: #12 Order of Recusal. (blb) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE for all further proceedings. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 6/18/19. (blb) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed Re: #11 Amended REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (blb) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AMENDED DOCUMENT by MELISSA GOWANS. Amendment to #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (ZEIG, JUSTIN) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (ZEIG, JUSTIN) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 5/17/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/17 /2019. Discovery due by 8/30/2019. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 5/3/19. (blb) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #5 Answer to Complaint, #6 Corporate Disclosure and #8 Summons Returned Executed. (blb) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MELISSA GOWANS. MERCHANTS ADJUSTMENT SERVICE INC served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019. (ZEIG, JUSTIN) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • (#7) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: ISO prepared and placed in WS Referral folder. (blb) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by MERCHANTS ADJUSTMENT SERVICE INC. (KOHLMYER, ERNEST) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by MERCHANTS ADJUSTMENT SERVICE INC. (KOHLMYER, ERNEST) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Merchants Adjustment Service, Inc. (blb) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Attorney Justin Zeig Re #1 Complaint filed by Melissa Gowans.- Counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". Further, for future case openings: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide", (both available on the clerk's website). (blb) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (blb) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against JOHN DOES 1-25, Merchants Adjustment Service, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4441011.), filed by Melissa Gowans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ZEIG, JUSTIN) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less