This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/20/2023 at 07:36:05 (UTC).

Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Svetlana Fish, Physician, P.C. et al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 Government Employees Insurance Company filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Svetlana Fish, Physician, P C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are LaShann DeArcy Hall and Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-07093

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LaShann DeArcy Hall

Referral Judge

Ramon E. Reyes, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Government Employees Insurance Company

GEICO Indemnity Company

GEICO General Insurance Company

GEICO Casualty Company

Defendants

Svetlana Fish, Physician, P.C.

Complete Express Medical P.C.

Svetlana Fish, M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua D Smith

Attorney at Rivkin Radler LLP

926 Rxr Plaza

Uniondale, NY 11556

Michael A. Sirignano

Attorney at Rivkin, Radler LLP

926 Rxr Plaza

Uniondale, NY 11556-0926

Barry I. Levy

Attorney at Rivkin Radler LLP

926 Rxr Plaza

Uniondale, NY 11556-0926

Defendant Attorney

James R. Froccaro

20 Vanderventer Avenue, Suite 103W

Port Washington, NY 11050

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING AND ENJOINING COLLECTION PROCEEDINGS: Motion to Stay #11 , granted. (See Order for details). Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 12/22/2022. (ML) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. Svetlana Fish, MD served on 12/6/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Levy, Barry) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

11 #1

Stipulation and Order to Stay and Enjoin Underlying Collection Proceedings - Re

#11

(#11) Joint MOTION to Stay Joint Request to So Order Stipulation and Order to Stay and Enjoin Underlying Collection Proceedings by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Order to Stay and Enjoin Underlying Collection Proceedings - Request to So Order) (Smith, Joshua) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Froccaro on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Froccaro, James) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. Complete Express Medical P.C. served on 11/28/2022, answer due 12/19/2022. (Levy, Barry) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. Svetlana Fish, Physician, P.C. served on 11/28/2022, answer due 12/19/2022. (Levy, Barry) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua D Smith on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Smith, Joshua) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Sirignano on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Sirignano, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#5

(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#4

(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (SR) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (SR) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Levy, Barry) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

1 #4

Exhibit 2 - Complete Express Medical PC

1 #3

Exhibit 1 - Svetlana Fish Physician PC

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Complete Express Medical P.C., Svetlana Fish, MD, Svetlana Fish, Physician, P.C. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16159979 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit 1 - Svetlana Fish Physician PC, #4 Exhibit 2 - Complete Express Medical PC, #5 Exhibit 3 - Memoranda) (Levy, Barry) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING AND ENJOINING COLLECTION PROCEEDINGS: Motion to Stay #11 , granted. (See Order for details). Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 12/22/2022. (ML) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. Svetlana Fish, MD served on 12/6/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Levy, Barry) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint MOTION to Stay Joint Request to So Order Stipulation and Order to Stay and Enjoin Underlying Collection Proceedings by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Order to Stay and Enjoin Underlying Collection Proceedings - Request to So Order) (Smith, Joshua) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Froccaro on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Froccaro, James) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. Complete Express Medical P.C. served on 11/28/2022, answer due 12/19/2022. (Levy, Barry) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. Svetlana Fish, Physician, P.C. served on 11/28/2022, answer due 12/19/2022. (Levy, Barry) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua D Smith on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Smith, Joshua) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Sirignano on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Sirignano, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (SR) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (SR) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SR) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Levy, Barry) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Complete Express Medical P.C., Svetlana Fish, MD, Svetlana Fish, Physician, P.C. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16159979 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit 1 - Svetlana Fish Physician PC, #4 Exhibit 2 - Complete Express Medical PC, #5 Exhibit 3 - Memoranda) (Levy, Barry) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant