This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/23/2022 at 07:33:06 (UTC).

Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Progressive Medical Care, P.C. et al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Government Employees Insurance Company filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Progressive Medical Care, P C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joanna Seybert and Steven I. Locke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-06575

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joanna Seybert

Referral Judge

Steven I. Locke

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Government Employees Insurance Company

GEICO Indemnity Company

GEICO General Insurance Company

GEICO Casualty Company

Defendants

Progressive Medical Care, P.C.

Allan Hausknecht, M.D.

John Doe Defendants "1" - "10"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael A. Sirignano

Attorney at Rivkin, Radler LLP

926 Rxr Plaza

Uniondale, NY 11556-0926

Frank Peter Tiscione, Jr.

Attorney at Rivkin Radler

926 Rxr Plaza

Uniondale, NY 11556

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew J. Conroy

Attorney at Schwartz, Conroy & Hack, PC

666 Old Country Roadsuite 900

Garden City, NY 11530

Robert E. B. Hewitt, III

Attorney at Schwartz, Conroy & Hack, PC

666 Old Country Road

Garden City, NY 11530

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Peter Tiscione, Jr on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Tiscione, Frank) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

11 #1

Stipulation Extending Time to Answer

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. Allan Hausknecht, MD served on 12/17/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. (Sirignano, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. Progressive Medical Care, P.C. served on 12/20/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (Sirignano, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. B. Hewitt, III on behalf of Allan Hausknecht, MD, Progressive Medical Care, P.C. (aty to be noticed) (Hewitt, Robert) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Conroy on behalf of Allan Hausknecht, MD, Progressive Medical Care, P.C. (aty to be noticed) (Conroy, Matthew) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Allan Hausknecht, MD, Progressive Medical Care, P.C. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Sirignano, Michael) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#4

(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

3 #1

Additional Corrections

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Sirignano, Michael) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

1 #4

Exhibit 2 - Sample Letter of Medical Necessity

1 #3

Exhibit 1 - Representative Sample of Fraudulent Claims Identified to Date

1 #2

Proposed Summons and Rider

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic ORDER granting DE #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, the deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 1/30/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 1/9/2022. (Pincsak, Lydia) (Entered: 01/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Peter Tiscione, Jr on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Tiscione, Frank) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Plaintiffs' Consent by Allan Hausknecht, MD, Progressive Medical Care, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer) (Conroy, Matthew) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. Allan Hausknecht, MD served on 12/17/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. (Sirignano, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. Progressive Medical Care, P.C. served on 12/20/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (Sirignano, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. B. Hewitt, III on behalf of Allan Hausknecht, MD, Progressive Medical Care, P.C. (aty to be noticed) (Hewitt, Robert) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Conroy on behalf of Allan Hausknecht, MD, Progressive Medical Care, P.C. (aty to be noticed) (Conroy, Matthew) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Allan Hausknecht, MD, Progressive Medical Care, P.C. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Sirignano, Michael) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE: Proposed summons is rejected; the caption on the summons does not match the caption of the complaint. The Clerk's Office cannot issue the summons with an incorrect caption. Counsel is advised to submit completed proposed summons using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/24/2021: #1 Additional Corrections) (Jakubowski, Laura). (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Sirignano, Michael) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Allan Hausknecht, MD, John Doe Defendants "1" - "10", Progressive Medical Care, P.C. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15059480 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes,, filed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons and Rider, #3 Exhibit 1 - Representative Sample of Fraudulent Claims Identified to Date, #4 Exhibit 2 - Sample Letter of Medical Necessity) (Sirignano, Michael) Modified on 11/24/2021 (Jakubowski, Laura). (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant