This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/02/2023 at 08:06:44 (UTC).

Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Mayzenberg et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 Government Employees Insurance Company filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Mayzenberg. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dora Lizette Irizarry and Lois Bloom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00751

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dora Lizette Irizarry

Referral Judge

Lois Bloom

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Government Employees Insurance Company

GEICO Indemnity Company

GEICO General Insurance Company

Geico Casualty Company

Defendants

Eleonara Mayzenberg

Ilona Mayzenberg

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven T. Henesy

Barry I. Levy

Garin Scollan

Michael A. Sirignano

Defendant Attorneys

Brad Adam Schlossberg

Gary C. Fischoff

 

Court Documents

19 #1

Exhibit Affidavit of Mailing, Shipping Label, and Letter to Defendants Enclosing

#19

(#19) Letter to Judge Irizarry Enclosing Proof of Mailing of Default Motion (ECF No. 16) to Defendants by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Mailing, Shipping Label, and Letter to Defendants Enclosing Default Motion and Complaint) (Henesy, Steven) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C. Fischoff on behalf of Ilona Mayzenberg, Eleonara Mayzenberg (aty to be noticed) (Fischoff, Gary) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Brad Adam Schlossberg on behalf of Ilona Mayzenberg, Eleonara Mayzenberg (aty to be noticed) (Schlossberg, Brad) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

16 #2

Declaration Declaration of Steven T. Henesy with Exhibits "1" (Propose

16 #1

Memorandum in Support

#16

(#16) MOTION for Default Judgment by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration Declaration of Steven T. Henesy with Exhibits "1" (Proposed Default Judgment) and "2" Excerpts of Deposition of Ilona Mayzenberg) (Henesy, Steven) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

#15

(#15) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Ilona Mayzenberg has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Ilona Mayzenberg is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JP) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

14 #2

Exhibit A-Certificate of Manpower/Military

1 #9

Exhibit 7-Copy of the Notice of Property Value for the Property from the New Yor

1 #8

Exhibit 6- Copy of the recorded mortgage

1 #7

Exhibit 5-Copy of the deed recorded in the Office of the City Register of the C

1 #6

Exhibit 4-Copy of the writ of execution and the receipt and return of that writ,

1 #4

Exhibit 2-Copy of the Judgment

1 #3

Exhibit 1-Copy of the Courts decision on Summary Judgment Motion

1 #2

Proposed Summons and Rider

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Ilona Mayzenberg, Eleonara Mayzenberg filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16365841 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Government Employees Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons and Rider, #3 Exhibit 1-Copy of the Courts decision on Summary Judgment Motion, #4 Exhibit 2-Copy of the Judgment, #5 Exhibit 3-Copy of the recorded Judgment, #6 Exhibit 4-Copy of the writ of execution and the receipt and return of that writ, evidencing its service and delivery, #7 Exhibit 5-Copy of the deed recorded in the Office of the City Register of the City of New York, #8 Exhibit 6- Copy of the recorded mortgage, #9 Exhibit 7-Copy of the Notice of Property Value for the Property from the New York City Department of Finance, dated January 15, 2022) (Henesy, Steven) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Letter to Judge Irizarry Enclosing Proof of Mailing of Default Motion (ECF No. 16) to Defendants by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Mailing, Shipping Label, and Letter to Defendants Enclosing Default Motion and Complaint) (Henesy, Steven) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C. Fischoff on behalf of Ilona Mayzenberg, Eleonara Mayzenberg (aty to be noticed) (Fischoff, Gary) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Brad Adam Schlossberg on behalf of Ilona Mayzenberg, Eleonara Mayzenberg (aty to be noticed) (Schlossberg, Brad) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Default Judgment by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration Declaration of Steven T. Henesy with Exhibits "1" (Proposed Default Judgment) and "2" Excerpts of Deposition of Ilona Mayzenberg) (Henesy, Steven) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Ilona Mayzenberg has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Ilona Mayzenberg is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JP) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Request for Certificate of Default by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Certificate of Default against Defendant Ilona Mayzenberg, #2 Exhibit A-Certificate of Manpower/Military) (Henesy, Steven) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Eleonara Mayzenberg has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Eleonara Mayzenberg is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JP) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge I. Leo Glasser recused. Case reassigned to Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry for all further proceedings. Type of Recusal: party. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 3/9/2023. (BBM) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge I. Leo Glasser and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom for all further proceedings. Judge Eric N. Vitaliano, Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 3/8/2023. (SR) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Request for Certificate of Default by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Certificate of Default for Eleonara Mayzenberg, #2 Exhibit A- Certificate of Manpower) (Henesy, Steven) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Government Employees Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. Eleonara Mayzenberg served on 2/8/2023, answer due 3/1/2023. (Henesy, Steven) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Garin Scollan on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Scollan, Garin) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Sirignano on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Sirignano, Michael) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Barry I. Levy on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Levy, Barry) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Ilona Mayzenberg, Eleonara Mayzenberg. (KD) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Henesy, Steven) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ilona Mayzenberg, Eleonara Mayzenberg filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16365841 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Government Employees Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons and Rider, #3 Exhibit 1-Copy of the Courts decision on Summary Judgment Motion, #4 Exhibit 2-Copy of the Judgment, #5 Exhibit 3-Copy of the recorded Judgment, #6 Exhibit 4-Copy of the writ of execution and the receipt and return of that writ, evidencing its service and delivery, #7 Exhibit 5-Copy of the deed recorded in the Office of the City Register of the City of New York, #8 Exhibit 6- Copy of the recorded mortgage, #9 Exhibit 7-Copy of the Notice of Property Value for the Property from the New York City Department of Finance, dated January 15, 2022) (Henesy, Steven) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less