This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2023 at 08:54:50 (UTC).

Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Katanov et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 Government Employees Insurance Company filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Katanov. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Peggy Kuo and LaShann DeArcy Hall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-07153

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Peggy Kuo

Presiding Judge

LaShann DeArcy Hall

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Government Employees Insurance Company

GEICO Indemnity Company

GEICO General Insurance Company

GEICO Casualty Company

Defendants

Albert Katanov

John Doe Defendants 1 through 10

Allmed Merchandise & Trading Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Barry I. Levy

Attorney at Rivkin Radler LLP

926 Rxr Plaza

Uniondale, NY 11556-0926

Michael A. Sirignano

Attorney at Rivkin, Radler LLP

926 Rxr Plaza

Uniondale, NY 11556-0926

John Paul Mulvaney

Attorney at Rivkin Radler LLP

926 Rxr Plaza, Uniondale

Uniondale, NY 11556

Defendant Attorneys

Keith J. Roberts

Attorney at Brach Eichler LLC

101 Eisenhower Pkwy, Ste 101

Roseland, NJ 07068

Shannon Carroll

Attorney at Brach Eichler LLC

101 Eisenhower Parkway, Ste 201

Roseland, NJ 07068

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Allmed Merchandise & Trading Inc., Albert Katanov. (Carroll, Shannon) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

#15

(#15) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Allmed Merchandise & Trading Inc., Albert Katanov. (Carroll, Shannon) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Carroll on behalf of Albert Katanov (aty to be noticed) (Carroll, Shannon) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Carroll on behalf of Allmed Merchandise & Trading Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Carroll, Shannon) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Keith J. Roberts on behalf of Albert Katanov (aty to be noticed) (Roberts, Keith) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Keith J. Roberts on behalf of Allmed Merchandise & Trading Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Roberts, Keith) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. Allmed Merchandise & Trading Inc. served on 12/5/2022, answer due 12/26/2022. (Levy, Barry) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. Albert Katanov served on 12/1/2022, answer due 12/22/2022. (Levy, Barry) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held by telephone in this case on March 2, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge. All counsel are required to attend. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. (The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office.)Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. By February 24, 2023, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: # https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/PK-discovplan.pdf Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to ensure that Defendants are aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 12/2/2022. (RO) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by John Paul Mulvaney on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Mulvaney, John) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Sirignano on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Sirignano, Michael) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#5

(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#4

(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (SR) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Allmed Merchandise & Trading Inc., Albert Katanov. (SR) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

1 #3

Exhibit 1 Representative Sample of Fraudulent Claims Identified to Date Allmed

1 #2

Proposed Summons and Rider

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Allmed Merchandise & Trading Inc., John Doe Defendants 1 through 10, Albert Katanov filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16167519 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons and Rider, #3 Exhibit 1 Representative Sample of Fraudulent Claims Identified to Date Allmed Merchandise & Trading Inc.) (Levy, Barry) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Allmed Merchandise & Trading Inc., Albert Katanov. (Carroll, Shannon) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for defendants Allmed Merchandise & Trading Inc. and Albert Katanov to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended nunc pro tunc to January 20, 2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 1/3/2023. (RO) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Allmed Merchandise & Trading Inc., Albert Katanov. (Carroll, Shannon) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Carroll on behalf of Albert Katanov (aty to be noticed) (Carroll, Shannon) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Carroll on behalf of Allmed Merchandise & Trading Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Carroll, Shannon) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Keith J. Roberts on behalf of Albert Katanov (aty to be noticed) (Roberts, Keith) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Keith J. Roberts on behalf of Allmed Merchandise & Trading Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Roberts, Keith) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. Allmed Merchandise & Trading Inc. served on 12/5/2022, answer due 12/26/2022. (Levy, Barry) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. Albert Katanov served on 12/1/2022, answer due 12/22/2022. (Levy, Barry) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held by telephone in this case on March 2, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge. All counsel are required to attend. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. (The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office.)Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. By February 24, 2023, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: # https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/PK-discovplan.pdf Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to ensure that Defendants are aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 12/2/2022. (RO) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by John Paul Mulvaney on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Mulvaney, John) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Sirignano on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Sirignano, Michael) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (SR) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Allmed Merchandise & Trading Inc., Albert Katanov. (SR) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SR) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation for GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Levy, Barry) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Allmed Merchandise & Trading Inc., John Doe Defendants 1 through 10, Albert Katanov filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16167519 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons and Rider, #3 Exhibit 1 Representative Sample of Fraudulent Claims Identified to Date Allmed Merchandise & Trading Inc.) (Levy, Barry) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant