This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/19/2021 at 09:52:00 (UTC).

Govan v. Remariaz et al

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 Govan filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Remariaz. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheri Polster Chappell and Mac R. McCoy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00639

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheri Polster Chappell

Referral Judge

Mac R. McCoy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alexander R. Govan

5964 Us Hwy 90

Live Oak, FL 32060

Defendants

Remariaz

Cal

Hopes

Osbourne

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Mailing Envelope

#2

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/26/2021. (RMT) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER transferring this case to the Ft. Myers Division of this Court; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 8/25/2021. (CAW) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Govan Alexander. (KEM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cal, Hopes, Osbourne, Remariaz filed by Govan Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Mailing Envelope)(KEM)(No service copies provided) (KEM). (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where H.O.P.E., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE CAL AGENTS REALTY, INC. is a litigant