This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/10/2021 at 08:44:55 (UTC).

Govaert et al v. The Kroger Company

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 Govaert filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against The Kroger Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew W. McFarland and Timothy S. Black. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00174

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Matthew W. McFarland

Timothy S. Black

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tina Govaert

Don Moore

Defendant

The Kroger Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Scott Goldenberg

Attorney at Goldenberg Schneider, LPA

4445 Lake Forest Drive, Suite 490

Cincinnati, OH 45242

Gary E. Mason

Attorney at Mason Lietz & Klinger LLP

5101 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Suite 305

Washington, DC 20016

Charles E Schaffer

Attorney at Levin Sedran & Berman

510 Walnut Street, Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Terence Richard Coates

Attorney at Markovits, Stock & DeMarco, LLC

3825 Edwards Road, Suite 650

Cincinnati, OH 45209

David C. Magagna, Jr.

Attorney at Levin, Sedran & Berman, LLP

510 Walnut Street, Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Todd B Naylor

Attorney at Goldenberg Schneider, LPA

4445 Lake Forest Drive, Suite 490

Cincinnati, OH 45242

Defendant Attorney

Nathaniel Lampley, Jr

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease - 1

301 E. Fourth Street, Suite 3500, Great American Tower

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1: Govaert Notice Letter

1 #2

Exhibit 2: Moore Notice Letter

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

#8

#12

#15

#5

#13

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: The Kroger Company answer due 6/21/2021. (rrs) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotation Order: This civil action is before the Court on the parties' joint motion (Doc. #16 ) for an extension of time for Defendant to respond to the complaint (Doc. #1 ). For good cause shown, that motion is GRANTED (Doc. #16 ). The date to respond to the complaint is now 6/21/2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 5/3/2021. (rrs) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, New date requested 6/21/2021. by Defendant The Kroger Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lampley, Nathaniel) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that case numbers 1:21-cv-279, 1:21-cv-146, 1:21-cv-174, 1:21-cv-198, 1:21-cv-226 and 1:21-cv-240 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. (kh) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiffs Tina Govaert, Don Moore. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Coates, Terence) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Terence Richard Coates for Plaintiffs Tina Govaert, Don Moore (Coates, Terence) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that the cases and case numbers 1:21-cv-240, 1:21-cv-146, 1:21-cv-174, 1:21-cv-198, 1:21-cv-226 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 4/19/2021. (kh) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gary E. Mason as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 4/14/2021. (eh) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8261465) of Gary E. Mason by Plaintiffs Tina Govaert, Don Moore. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Goldenberg, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER signed by Judge Timothy S. Black and Judge Douglas R. Cole on 3/31/2021. The Judges agree that Case 1:21cv198 IS related to Cases 1:21cv146 and 1:21cv174. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. (eh) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles E. Schaffer as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for efilingthrough PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 3/29/2021. (eh) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8234338) of Charles E. Schaffer by Plaintiffs Tina Govaert, Don Moore. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Goldenberg, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to The Kroger Company on 3/18/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (Goldenberg, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David C. Magagna, Jr. as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 3/18/2021. (eh) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8223106) of David C. Magagna, Jr. by Plaintiffs Tina Govaert, Don Moore. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Goldenberg, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER signed by Judge Timothy S. Black and Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 3/17/2021. The Judges agree that Case numbers 1:21cv146 and 1:21cv174 ARE related. Case 1:21cv174 reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. (eh) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The Kroger Company ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8212727), filed by Tina Govaert, Don Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Govaert Notice Letter, #2 Exhibit 2: Moore Notice Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Goldenberg, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathaniel Lampley, Jr.