This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:22:48 (UTC).

GOURDINE v. SYNCHRONY BANK

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Finance - Consumer Credit case was filed by GOURDINE against SYNCHRONY BANK in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17154

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Edward S. Kiel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAUN GOURDINE

Defendant

SYNCHRONY BANK

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#3

(#3) MOTION to Dismiss by SYNCHRONY BANK. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(BUTTNER, ETHAN) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

3 #2

Text of Proposed Order

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SYNCHRONY BANK from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY - UNION COUNTY, case number SC-694-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9916470), filed by SYNCHRONY BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(BUTTNER, ETHAN) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SYNCHRONY BANK identifying SYNCHRONY FINANCIAL as Corporate Parent.. (BUTTNER, ETHAN) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

3 #1

Brief

3 #3

Certificate of Service

1 #3

Certificate of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #3 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Dismiss by SYNCHRONY BANK. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(BUTTNER, ETHAN) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SYNCHRONY BANK identifying SYNCHRONY FINANCIAL as Corporate Parent.. (BUTTNER, ETHAN) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (eu, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SYNCHRONY BANK from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY - UNION COUNTY, case number SC-694-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9916470), filed by SYNCHRONY BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(BUTTNER, ETHAN) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.