This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 08:21:52

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Other case was filed by GOURDINE against SYNCHRONY BANK in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 2:19-CV-17158
  • Filing Date 08/23/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Other
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge James B. Clark
  • Courthouse New Jersey District

Party Details

  • Plaintiff SHAUN GOURDINE
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Defendant SYNCHRONY BANK
  • Represented By
    • ETHAN REEVES BUTTNER

Court Documents

3 #3

Certificate of Service

Fees Apply
3 #2

Text of Proposed Order

Fees Apply
3 #1

Brief

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) MOTION to Dismiss by SYNCHRONY BANK. (Attachments: #1 B...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SYNCHRONY BANK identi...

Fees Apply
1 #3

Certificate of Service

Fees Apply
1 #2

Exhibit 2

Fees Apply
1 #1

Exhibit 1

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, ) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
  • 08/29/2019
  • (#3) MOTION to Dismiss by SYNCHRONY BANK. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(BUTTNER, ETHAN) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
  • 08/29/2019
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SYNCHRONY BANK identifying SYNCHRONY FINANCIAL as Corporate Parent.. (BUTTNER, ETHAN) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
  • 08/26/2019
  • Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (eu, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SYNCHRONY BANK from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY - UNION COUNTY, case number SC-698-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9916531), filed by SYNCHRONY BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(BUTTNER, ETHAN) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.