This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/01/2021 at 09:24:25 (UTC).

GOULET v. MADERLY LTD. et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 GOULET filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against MADERLY LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is William S. Stickman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00726

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William S. Stickman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALAN GOULET

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

MADERLY LTD. doing business as U.S. FILM CREW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan E. Carreon

Attorney at Higbee & Associates

1504 Brookhollow Drive, Suite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

8 #4

AO 121

8 #3

Exhibit B

8 #2

Exhibit A

8 #1

Complaint

#8

(#8) COPYRIGHT DOCUMENTS ISSUED. Emailed copy of Transmittal Letter, AO 121 Form, Complaint, Exhibits and Docket Sheet to the Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 AO 121, #5 Docket Sheet) (lar) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

6 #2

Proposed Order

6 #1

Affidavit

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent by ALAN GOULET . (Carreon, Ryan) Modified on 6/22/2021 (lar). (Entered: 06/18/2021)

#4

(#4) AO 121 NOTICE by ALAN GOULET re Quality Control message - Attorney to submit AO 121 Notice, (Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to MADERLY LTD. (lar) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

#3

(#3) PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (lar) Modified on 6/3/2021 (lar). (Entered: 06/03/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE, MADERLY LTD. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6543750), filed by ALAN GOULET. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (lar) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) COPYRIGHT DOCUMENTS ISSUED. Emailed copy of Transmittal Letter, AO 121 Form, Complaint, Exhibits and Docket Sheet to the Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 AO 121, #5 Docket Sheet) (lar) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Ryan Carreon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Carreon is admitted pro hac vice on behalf of ALAN GOULET. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 06/21/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for attorney Ryan E. Carreon to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6570672) by ALAN GOULET. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent by ALAN GOULET . (Carreon, Ryan) Modified on 6/22/2021 (lar). (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 121 NOTICE by ALAN GOULET re Quality Control message - Attorney to submit AO 121 Notice, (Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint. Attorney to submit AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. Attorney advised to file the Notice within 7 days. The link to the report can be found under Other Forms at: http://www.uscourts.gov/FormsAndFees/Forms/CourtFormsByCategory.aspx (lar) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to MADERLY LTD. (lar) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (lar) Modified on 6/3/2021 (lar). (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE, MADERLY LTD. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6543750), filed by ALAN GOULET. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (lar) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan E Carreon