This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 08:17:06 (UTC).

Goulding v. Hopkins et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Goulding filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Hopkins. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dustin B. Pead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00957

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dustin B. Pead

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shaun Robert Goulding

Defendants

Jeffery Hopkins

Intrepid Wendover Nugget

Wendover Nugget Operator

Wedover Resorts Operator

Maverick Wendover

Generation 2000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Milda Shibonis

Attorney at INTERMOUNTAIN LEGAL PC

2159 S 700 E Suite 240

Salt Lake City, UT 84106

Daniel F. Bertch

Attorney at BERTCH ASSOCIATES

7070 S 2300 E Ste 100

Salt Lake City, UT 84121

Defendant Attorneys

Heinz J. Mahler

Attorney at KIPP & CHRISTIAN

10 Exchange Place Fourth Fl

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-2314

Robert L. Janicki

Attorney at STRONG & HANNI

9350 S 150 E Ste 820

Sandy, UT 84070

Matthew A. Jones

Attorney at STRONG & HANNI

9350 S 150 E Ste 820

Sandy, UT 84070

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Generation 2000, Intrepid Wendover Nugget, Maverick Wendover, Wedover Resorts Operator, Wendover Nugget Operator and Plaintiff Shaun Robert Goulding. (tlh) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

2 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#15) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) to Amended Complaint Subject to Proof of Service of Summons filed by Jeffery Hopkins. (Mahler, Heinz) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

2 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

5 #2

State Amended Complaint

19 #4

Exhibit D - Affidavit of Matthew A. Jones

#4

(#4) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/5/2019. (las) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Defendants Generation 2000, Intrepid Wendover Nugget, Maverick Wendover, Wedover Resorts Operator and Wendover Nugget Operator are directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#22

(#22) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendants Generation 2000, Jeffery Hopkins, Intrepid Wendover Nugget, Maverick Wendover, Wedover Resorts Operator, Wendover Nugget Operator, Plaintiff Shaun Robert Goulding. (nl) (Entered: 02/01/2020)

19 #3

Exhibit C - Utah State Court Docket

#16

(#16) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Generation 2000, Jeffery Hopkins, Intrepid Wendover Nugget, Maverick Wendover, Wedover Resorts Operator, Wendover Nugget Operator, Plaintiff Shaun Robert Goulding. Form due by 1/31/2020. (nl) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

19 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Kathy Hernandez

5 #3

State Notice of Removal

19 #2

Exhibit B - Affidavit of Daniel Watts

#20

(#20) Joint MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Strike and Memorandum in Support , #10 MOTION to Remand to Utah Third District - Salt Lake County and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Jeffery Hopkins. (Mahler, Heinz) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

2 #2

Exhibit B - Amended Complaint

#19

(#19) Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Strike and Memorandum in Support , #10 MOTION to Remand to Utah Third District - Salt Lake County and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Generation 2000, Intrepid Wendover Nugget, Maverick Wendover, Wedover Resorts Operator, Wendover Nugget Operator. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Kathy Hernandez, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Daniel Watts, #3 Exhibit C - Utah State Court Docket, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Matthew A. Jones)(Janicki, Robert) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#14

(#14) MOTION to Strike and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Shaun Robert Goulding. (Bertch, Daniel) (Entered: 01/05/2020)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendants Generation 2000, Jeffery Hopkins, Intrepid Wendover Nugget, Maverick Wendover, Wedover Resorts Operator, Wendover Nugget Operator, Plaintiff Shaun Robert Goulding. (nl) (Entered: 02/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#21) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Generation 2000, Intrepid Wendover Nugget, Maverick Wendover, Wedover Resorts Operator, Wendover Nugget Operator. (nl) (Entered: 02/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Joint MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Strike and Memorandum in Support , #10 MOTION to Remand to Utah Third District - Salt Lake County and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Jeffery Hopkins. (Mahler, Heinz) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Strike and Memorandum in Support , #10 MOTION to Remand to Utah Third District - Salt Lake County and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Generation 2000, Intrepid Wendover Nugget, Maverick Wendover, Wedover Resorts Operator, Wendover Nugget Operator. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Kathy Hernandez, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Daniel Watts, #3 Exhibit C - Utah State Court Docket, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Matthew A. Jones)(Janicki, Robert) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Docket(#18) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Jeffery Hopkins. (nl) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Docket(#17) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Shaun Robert Goulding. (nl) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Generation 2000, Jeffery Hopkins, Intrepid Wendover Nugget, Maverick Wendover, Wedover Resorts Operator, Wendover Nugget Operator, Plaintiff Shaun Robert Goulding. Form due by 1/31/2020. (nl) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) to Amended Complaint Subject to Proof of Service of Summons filed by Jeffery Hopkins. (Mahler, Heinz) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Strike and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Shaun Robert Goulding. (Bertch, Daniel) (Entered: 01/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Consent to Removal to the Jurisdiction of the United States District Court, District of Utah Subject to Proof of Service of Summons by Jeffery Hopkins (Mahler, Heinz) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Remand to Utah Third District - Salt Lake County and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Shaun Robert Goulding. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Return of Service - Hopkins)(Bertch, Daniel) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel F. Bertch on behalf of Shaun Robert Goulding (Bertch, Daniel) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Generation 2000.(Janicki, Robert) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Generation 2000 (Janicki, Robert) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Intrepid Wendover Nugget, Maverick Wendover, Wedover Resorts Operator, Wendover Nugget Operator.(Janicki, Robert) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) File Received from 3rd District, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and filings from state court. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 State Amended Complaint, #3 State Notice of Removal) (nl) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/5/2019. (las) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Generation 2000, Intrepid Wendover Nugget, Maverick Wendover, Wedover Resorts Operator, Wendover Nugget Operator and Plaintiff Shaun Robert Goulding. (tlh) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third District Court of Salt Lake County, case number 190908620, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3433683) filed by Wendover Nugget Operator, Wedover Resorts Operator, Maverick Wendover, Intrepid Wendover Nugget, Generation 2000. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Janicki, Robert) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Defendants Generation 2000, Intrepid Wendover Nugget, Maverick Wendover, Wedover Resorts Operator and Wendover Nugget Operator are directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.