This case was last updated from PACER on 04/22/2019 at 07:36:20 (UTC).

Goudeau et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 Goudeau filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David Hittner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00612

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Hittner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Juliet Goudeau

Maurice Goudeau

Defendants

C.R. Bard, Inc.

Covidien, LP

Davol Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ronald Lee Bair

Attorney at Bair Hilty PC

14711 Pebble Bend Dr

Houston, TX 77068

David Arlington Talbot, III

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

910 Louisiana

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Julie A Hardin

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

Matthew T Nickel

Attorney at DLA Piper

1900 N. Pearl, Suite 2200

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint by Covidien, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nickel, Matthew) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Covidien, LP identifying Medtronic plc as Corporate Parent, filed.(Nickel, Matthew) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol Inc., filed.(Hardin, Julie) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Covidien LP shall have an extension of time through and including March 14, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' original complaint.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 234th District Court, case number 2019-04003 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21919880) filed by Davol Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardin, Julie) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Davol Inc. identifying C.R. Bard, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Hardin, Julie) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Juliet Goudeau, Maurice Goudeau, filed.(Bair, Ronald) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Talbot on behalf of Juliet Goudeau, Maurice Goudeau, filed. (Bair, Ronald) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Talbot on behalf of Juliet Goudeau, Maurice Goudeau, filed. (Bair, Ronald) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C.R. Bard, Inc. identifying Becton, Dickinson and Company as Corporate Parent, filed.(Hardin, Julie) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#12

(#12) JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-23) transferring case to Southern District of Ohio to be included in MDL Docket No. 2846. (lgouadi, 4) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2019
  • RECEIPT of Transfer received via email notification: transfer of case to Southern District of Ohio. New Case # assigned: 2:19-cv-00934 and received on 03/13/2019., filed. (BrendaLacy, 4) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Interdistrict transfer to Southern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-23) transferring case to Southern District of Ohio to be included in MDL Docket No. 2846. (lgouadi, 4) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Talbot on behalf of Juliet Goudeau, Maurice Goudeau, filed. (Bair, Ronald) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Juliet Goudeau, Maurice Goudeau, filed.(Bair, Ronald) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Talbot on behalf of Juliet Goudeau, Maurice Goudeau, filed. (Bair, Ronald) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Covidien LP shall have an extension of time through and including March 14, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' original complaint.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Covidien, LP identifying Medtronic plc as Corporate Parent, filed.(Nickel, Matthew) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint by Covidien, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nickel, Matthew) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol Inc., filed.(Hardin, Julie) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C.R. Bard, Inc. identifying Becton, Dickinson and Company as Corporate Parent, filed.(Hardin, Julie) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Davol Inc. identifying C.R. Bard, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Hardin, Julie) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 234th District Court, case number 2019-04003 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21919880) filed by Davol Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardin, Julie) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.