This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/29/2021 at 06:15:45 (UTC).

Bagrat Goroyan v. BMW of North America, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 Bagrat Goroyan filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and Sheri Pym. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-06203

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bagrat Goroyan

Defendants

BMW of North America, LLC

Does 1 through 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Armine Markosyan

Attorney at Law Offices of Armine Markosyan

417 Arden Avenue Suite 114-D

Glendale, CA 91203

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew K Stefatos

Attorney at Lehrman Villegas Chinery and Douglas LLP

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Daniel R Villegas

Attorney at Lehrman Villegas Chinery and Douglas LLP

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kate S Lehrman

Attorney at Lehrman Villegas Chinery and Douglas LLP

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Declaration

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit C

#2

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • Docket(#22) MINUTES (In Chambers): Order DENYING AS MOOT Motion to Remand #16 and STRIKING Text Entry 21 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. See minute order for details. (lom) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docket(#21) STRICKEN, see docket entry no. 22 - The hearing on the MOTION TO REMAND #16 , scheduled for October 4, 2021 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY Modified on 9/28/2021 (lom). (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket(#20) Evidentiary Objection to Declaration of Armine Markosyan ISO of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Opposition re: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Stanley Mosk Courthouse #18 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket(#19) OPPOSITION to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Stanley Mosk Courthouse #18 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • Docket(#18) First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Stanley Mosk Courthouse filed by Plaintiff Bagrat Goroyan. Motion set for hearing on 10/18/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Markosyan, Armine) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Stanley Mosk Courthouse #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Missing LR 6.1 formal Notice of Motion TEXT PARAGRAPH re hearing date, time, Judge and courtroom, designated Courthouse and its Street Location information. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • Docket(#16) First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Stanley Mosk Courthouse filed by Plaintiff Bagrat Goroyan. Motion set for hearing on 10/4/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Markosyan, Armine) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Stanley Mosk Courthouse #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other error(s) with document(s): Missing LR 6.1 formal Notice of Motion TEXT re hearing date, time, Judge and courtroom, designated Courthouse and its Street Location information. As a result matter is Not set on Judge's Motion Calendar for hearing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • Docket(#14) First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Stanley Mosk Courthouse filed by Plaintiff Bagrat Goroyan. (Markosyan, Armine) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Docket(#13) ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for November 8, 2021 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II. (lc) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2021
  • Docket(#8) REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (dml) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge) (ghap) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #5 . Document # 5 Due to clerical error. The docket clerk docketed in error the Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • Docket(#5) [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 8/2/2021, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 6] Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2021: #1 Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge) (ghap). Modified on 8/2/2021 (ghap). (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants BMW of North America, LLC, Does 1 through 50, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Bagrat Goroyan. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/24/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV11405 Receipt No: ACACDC-31727001 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Attorney Andrew K Stefatos added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew K Stefatos

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kate S Lehrman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel R Villegas