This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:47:36 (UTC).

Goree v. Michigan Parole Board

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Goree filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Michigan Parole Board. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert J. Jonker and Ray Kent. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00395

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Jonker

Referral Judge

Ray Kent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Denver Goree #111992, Jr.

Muskegon Heights, MI 49444

Defendant

Michigan Parole Board

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Raina Korbakis

Attorney at MI Dept Attorney General (Appellate)

P.O. Box 30217

Lansing, MI 48909

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Proposed Document

#15

(#15) ORDER REJECTING Amended Complaint submitted by Denver Goree; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document) (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#14

(#14) JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed for failure to state a claim ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER denying Defendant's motion to dismiss for insufficient service of process #7 and Plaintiff's motion to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss #11 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#12

(#12) OPINION ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

11 #1

Attachment 1

#11

(#11) MOTION for order named as "Motion to respond to the defendants dismissal for insufficient service of process" by plaintiff Denver Goree #111992, Jr; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ns) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of receipt of case (ns) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#9

(#9) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:19-cv-10869; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (jlg) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

7 #4

Exhibit C--Sawyer v Lexington-Fayette (unpublished decision)

7 #3

Exhibit B--Sedore v Campbell (Order)

#7

(#13) ORDER denying Defendant's motion to dismiss for insufficient service of process #7 and Plaintiff's motion to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss #11 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Michigan Parole Board of Limited Appearance of Counsel, for purpose of challenging effectiveness of service of process (Korbakis, Raina) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#5

(#5) LETTER from Denver Goree re service of case (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#4

(#4) Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER to Correct Deficiency for failure to submit the filing fee. Correction due by 4/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Mediation Program (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Denver Goree against Michigan Parole Board (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 03/26/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #15 and proposed document sent via U.S. Mail to Denver Goree #111992, Jr. (mg) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER REJECTING Amended Complaint submitted by Denver Goree; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document) (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certified Copy of Opinion (Screening) #12 , Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case) #14 , Order on Motion for Order, #13 sent via U.S. Mail to Denver Goree #111992, Jr. (ns) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed for failure to state a claim ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER denying Defendant's motion to dismiss for insufficient service of process #7 and Plaintiff's motion to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss #11 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) OPINION ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for order named as "Motion to respond to the defendants dismissal for insufficient service of process" by plaintiff Denver Goree #111992, Jr; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ns) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Denver Goree #111992, Jr. (ns) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of receipt of case (ns) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:19-cv-10869; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (jlg) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #8 Transferring Case to Western District of Michigan on Denver Goree Pris. No. 111992 at Earnest C. Brooks Correctional Facility, 2500 S. Sheridan Drive, Muskegon Heights, MI 49444. (TMcg) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process, Brief in Support, Index of Exhibits, Exhibits A through C, with Certificate of Service by Michigan Parole Board. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A--Amy Moore, Asst to MI Parole Board, US Mail, #3 Exhibit B--Sedore v Campbell (Order), #4 Exhibit C--Sawyer v Lexington-Fayette (unpublished decision)) (Korbakis, Raina) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by Michigan Parole Board of Limited Appearance of Counsel, for purpose of challenging effectiveness of service of process (Korbakis, Raina) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) LETTER from Denver Goree re service of case (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • FILING FEE Received in the amount of 400.00 by Denver Goree - Receipt No. DET121631 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (BHan) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER to Correct Deficiency for failure to submit the filing fee. Correction due by 4/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Mediation Program (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Denver Goree against Michigan Parole Board (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less