This case was last updated from PACER on 09/04/2019 at 07:02:48 (UTC).

Gore & Associates Management Company, Inc. v. SLSCO Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2019 Gore Associates Management Company, Inc filed a Contract - Miller Act lawsuit against SLSCO Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gustavo A. Gelpi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01650

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Miller Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gustavo A. Gelpi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gore & Associates Management Company, Inc.

Defendants

SLSCO Ltd.

Hartford Fire Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Veronica Ferraiuoli-Hornedo

Attorney at Estudio Legal Ferraiuoli, PSC

Po Box 195384

San Juan, PR 00919-5384

Wendy L. Fisher

Attorney at Taylor & Associates P.L.

20 3D Street S.W., Suite 209

Winter Haven, FL 33880

Kristen M.J Johnson

Attorney at Taylor & Associates P.L.

20 3D Street S.W., Suite 209

Winter Haven, FL 33880

Defendant Attorneys

Paul A. Cortes-Ruiz

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges, LLC

250 Munoz Rivera Ave., Suite 800

San Juan, PR 00918

Alfredo F. Ramirez-Macdonald

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges

250 Munoz Rivera Ave., Suite 800

San Juan, PR 00918-1813

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Cortes-Ruiz on behalf of Hartford Fire Insurance Company, SLSCO Ltd. (Cortes-Ruiz, Paul) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement bySLSCO Ltd.. (Ramirez-Macdonald, Alfredo) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement byHartford Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Fire Insurance Company.. (Ramirez-Macdonald, Alfredo) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#11

(#11) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6 re: #1 Complaint filed by Alfredo F. Ramirez-Macdonald on behalf of Hartford Fire Insurance Company, SLSCO Ltd. Responses due by 8/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Ramirez-Macdonald, Alfredo) Modified on 8/8/2019 to edit docket text (gmm). (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Gore & Associates Management Company, Inc. upon Hartford Fire Insurance Company served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Ferraiuoli-Hornedo, Veronica) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Gore & Associates Management Company, Inc. upon SLSCO Ltd. served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Ferraiuoli-Hornedo, Veronica) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

1 #11

Summons Hartford Fire Insurance Company

1 #10

Summons SLSCO Ltd.

1 #9

Category Sheet

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit G: Uniify Assignment of Rights Agreement

1 #6

Exhibit F: Earthwrx Assignment of Rights Agreement

1 #5

Exhibit E: Gore and Associates Management Company Funding Agreement

1 #4

Exhibit D: Uniify of Puerto Rico, LLC Staffing Account Terms

1 #3

Exhibit C: USVI Subcontractor Agreement

1 #2

Exhibit B: PR Subcontractor Agreement

1 #1

Exhibit A: Hartford Fire Insurance Company Labor and Material Payment Bond, Bond

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6484253.), filed by Gore & Associates Management Company, Inc.. Service due by 10/4/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Hartford Fire Insurance Company Labor and Material Payment Bond, Bond No. 46BCSHU0780, #2 Exhibit B: PR Subcontractor Agreement, #3 Exhibit C: USVI Subcontractor Agreement, #4 Exhibit D: Uniify of Puerto Rico, LLC Staffing Account Terms, #5 Exhibit E: Gore and Associates Management Company Funding Agreement, #6 Exhibit F: Earthwrx Assignment of Rights Agreement, #7 Exhibit G: Uniify Assignment of Rights Agreement, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Category Sheet, #10 Summons SLSCO Ltd., #11 Summons Hartford Fire Insurance Company)(Ferraiuoli-Hornedo, Veronica) (Entered: 07/06/2019)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Cortes-Ruiz on behalf of Hartford Fire Insurance Company, SLSCO Ltd. (Cortes-Ruiz, Paul) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement bySLSCO Ltd.. (Ramirez-Macdonald, Alfredo) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER: Granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/8/2019. (AGF) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement byHartford Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Fire Insurance Company.. (Ramirez-Macdonald, Alfredo) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6 re: #1 Complaint filed by Alfredo F. Ramirez-Macdonald on behalf of Hartford Fire Insurance Company, SLSCO Ltd. Responses due by 8/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Ramirez-Macdonald, Alfredo) Modified on 8/8/2019 to edit docket text (gmm). (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Gore & Associates Management Company, Inc. upon Hartford Fire Insurance Company served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Ferraiuoli-Hornedo, Veronica) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Gore & Associates Management Company, Inc. upon SLSCO Ltd. served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Ferraiuoli-Hornedo, Veronica) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: Granting #3 Motion to Appear PHV; Granting #2 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 7/10/2019. (MET) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement byGore & Associates Management Company, Inc.. (Ferraiuoli-Hornedo, Veronica) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Hartford Fire Insurance Company, SLSCO Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (vdm) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Motion to allow Wendy Fisher to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6484255) filed by Veronica Ferraiuoli-Hornedo on behalf of Gore & Associates Management Company, Inc. Responses due by 7/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ferraiuoli-Hornedo, Veronica) (Entered: 07/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Motion to allow Kristen Johnson to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6484254) filed by Veronica Ferraiuoli-Hornedo on behalf of Gore & Associates Management Company, Inc. Responses due by 7/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ferraiuoli-Hornedo, Veronica) (Entered: 07/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6484253.), filed by Gore & Associates Management Company, Inc.. Service due by 10/4/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Hartford Fire Insurance Company Labor and Material Payment Bond, Bond No. 46BCSHU0780, #2 Exhibit B: PR Subcontractor Agreement, #3 Exhibit C: USVI Subcontractor Agreement, #4 Exhibit D: Uniify of Puerto Rico, LLC Staffing Account Terms, #5 Exhibit E: Gore and Associates Management Company Funding Agreement, #6 Exhibit F: Earthwrx Assignment of Rights Agreement, #7 Exhibit G: Uniify Assignment of Rights Agreement, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Category Sheet, #10 Summons SLSCO Ltd., #11 Summons Hartford Fire Insurance Company)(Ferraiuoli-Hornedo, Veronica) (Entered: 07/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.