This case was last updated from PACER on 02/08/2020 at 07:26:20 (UTC).

Gordon v. Azar et al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2019 Gordon filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Azar. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Bloom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-63041

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Bloom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Howard Gordon

Defendants

Alex Azar

Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services

United States Department of Health and Human Services

The United States of America

Washington, DC 20416

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bryan Scott Gowdy

Attorney at Creed & Gowdy, P.A.

865 May Street

Jacksonville, FL 32204

Floyd Benjamin Faglie

Attorney at Staunton & Faglie, PL

189 East Walnut Street

Monticello, FL 32344

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Howard Gordon. Alex Azar served on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020; The United States of America served on 12/31/2019, answer due 3/2/2020; United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Faglie, Floyd) Text Modified on 1/21/2020 (ail). (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bryan S. Gowdy for / by Howard Gordon. Responses due by 1/23/2020 (Gowdy, Bryan) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to United States Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

1 #5

Summon(s) Summons AFO

1 #4

Summon(s) Summons WB

1 #3

Summon(s) Summons DHHS

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Alex Azar, The United States of America, United States Department of Health and Human Services. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12214394, filed by Howard Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s) Summons DHHS, #4 Summon(s) Summons WB, #5 Summon(s) Summons AFO)(Gowdy, Bryan) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Howard Gordon. Alex Azar served on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020; The United States of America served on 12/31/2019, answer due 3/2/2020; United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Faglie, Floyd) Text Modified on 1/21/2020 (ail). (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Bryan Scott Gowdy permitted to withdraw from case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bryan S. Gowdy for / by Howard Gordon. Responses due by 1/23/2020 (Gowdy, Bryan) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to United States Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Alex Azar, The United States of America, United States Department of Health and Human Services. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12214394, filed by Howard Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s) Summons DHHS, #4 Summon(s) Summons WB, #5 Summon(s) Summons AFO)(Gowdy, Bryan) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bryan Scott Gowdy